EP3119984 - LONG OFFSET GAS CONDENSATE PRODUCTION SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.06.2017 [2017/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROZE, James George 1635 Colquitt Houston, Texas 77006 / US | 02 /
BHATNAGAR, Gaurav 2323 Eldridge Pkwy Apt. 114 Houston, Texas 77077 / US | 03 /
RAMANATHAN, Karthik 1415 Eldridge Pkwy 1124 Houston, Texas 77077 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 15712495.9 | 13.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US20323 | Priority number, date | US201461954254P | 17.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461954254 P | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142629 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119984 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E21B36/00, E21B43/36 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
E21B36/00 (EP,CN,US);
E21B43/0107 (US);
E21B43/0175 (EP,CN,US);
E21B43/36 (EP,CN,US);
E21B43/40 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LANGE VERSETZTE GASKONDENSATPRODUKTIONSSYSTEME | [2017/04] | English: | LONG OFFSET GAS CONDENSATE PRODUCTION SYSTEMS | [2017/04] | French: | SYSTÈMES DE PRODUCTION DE CONDENSATS GAZEUX FONCTIONNANT AVEC DE LONGUES DISTANCES DE DÉCALAGE | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 17.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.05.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0174473 (INGEN PROCESS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010155970 (POORTE EDWIN [NO], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [X]WO2011112102 (SINVENT AS [NO], et al) [X] 1,12,17 * abstract *; | [XY]WO2013023948 (STATOIL PETROLEUM AS [NO], et al) [X] 1,6,12,16-20 * page 1; figure 1 * * page 6, line 25 - page 7, line 14 * [Y] 7,15; | [XYI]WO2013187771 (AKER SUBSEA AS [NO]) [X] 1,3,5,12,14,16-20 * page 8, line 10 - page 9, line 15; figure 1 * * page 13, line 20 - line 30; figure 5 * [Y] 2,4,13 [I] 8-11; | [Y]WO2014031728 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [Y] 2,4,7,13,15 * abstract * |