EP3143071 - CROSS-LINKABLE MASSES BASED ON ORGANYL-OXYSILANE-TERMINATED POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Gisela-Stein-Straße 1 81671 München / DE | [2024/32] |
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states Wacker Chemie AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STANJEK, Volker Nelkenweg 5 84539 Ampfing / DE | 02 /
ZANDER, Lars Josef-Leitl-Str. 12 84503 Altötting / DE | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Mieskes, Klaus Theoderich Wacker Chemie AG Gisela-Stein-Straße 1 81671 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Budczinski, Angelika, et al Wacker Chemie AG Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15715269.5 | 10.04.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015EP57853 | Priority number, date | DE201410207506 | 17.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014207506 | [2017/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015158624 | Date: | 22.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143071 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/08, C09J183/10, C09J183/12 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
C09J183/12 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G77/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G77/26 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B05D3/108 (US);
C08G77/458 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08G77/46 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C09J183/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08K2003/2227 (US);
C08K2003/265 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Title | German: | VERNETZBARE MASSEN AUF BASIS VON ORGANYLOXYSILANTERMINIERTEN POLYMEREN | [2017/12] | English: | CROSS-LINKABLE MASSES BASED ON ORGANYL-OXYSILANE-TERMINATED POLYMERS | [2017/12] | French: | MATIÈRES RÉTICULABLES À BASE DE POLYMÈRES À TERMINAISON ORGANYLOXYSILANE | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 12.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2021 | Observations by third parties | 05.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Observations by third parties | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102011006130 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]); | [A]DE102011081264 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]); | [A]DE102011087604 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]); | [XI]DE102012201734 (WACKER CHEMIE AG [DE]) | other | US6602964 | US10030183 |