EP3129430 - SILAGE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Basic Industries Corporation Inc. P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | For all designated states Saudi Basic Industries Corporation Inc. P.O. Box 5101 11422 Riyadh / SA | ||
For all designated states SABIC Global Technologies B.V. Plasticslaan 1 4612 PX Bergen op Zoom / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLIMAN, Maria c/o SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 NL-6160 GA Geleen / NL | 02 /
MARTENS, Johannes Peter Antonius SABIC Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 3008 NL-6160 GA Geleen / NL | 03 /
DE JONG, Frits Pieter Eduard Anton BIOP Biopolymer Technologies AG Gostritzer Str. 61- 63 01217 Dresden / DE | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Sabic Intellectual Property Group Sabic Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 3008 6160 GA Geleen / NL | [2017/07] | Application number, filing date | 15715716.5 | 08.04.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015EP57550 | Priority number, date | EP20140164060 | 09.04.2014 Original published format: EP 14164060 | [2017/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015155198 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129430 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, C08L3/02, C08L23/00, A01F25/00, B32B9/02, B32B9/04, B32B27/08, B32B27/32 | [2017/07] | CPC: |
B32B9/045 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B9/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L3/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A01F25/13 (KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08F8/46 (KR);
C08J5/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08L23/06 (US);
C08L31/04 (KR);
C08L67/02 (US);
A01F2015/0745 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2307/7244 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2307/7246 (EP,CN,US);
B32B2410/00 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C08J2303/02 (CN);
C08J2323/04 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (EP,US);
C08J2403/02 (EP,US);
C08J2423/00 (CN);
C08J2423/04 (EP,US);
C08J2423/06 (CN);
C08L2201/14 (US);
C08L2203/16 (CN,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L3/02, C08L23/00 (CN,EP,US);
C08L3/02, C08L23/06 (US,CN,EP);
C08L3/02, C08L23/06, C08L31/04, C08L67/04 (US,CN,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Title | German: | SILAGEFOLIE | [2017/07] | English: | SILAGE FILM | [2017/07] | French: | FILM D'ENSILAGE | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 25.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007042207 (BERGER WERNER [DE], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0001]; claim - *; | [A]WO2007118280 (PLANTIC TECHNOLOGIES LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 1, line 10 - line 12 * * page 3, line 20 - line 21 ** claim - *; | [A]WO2008037749 (NOVAMONT SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,46 *; | [A]WO2008037744 (NOVAMONT SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,5,7,39,41 *; | [A]US2009312462 (OAKLEY NICHOLAS ROY [AU], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0014] - [0018]; claim - *; | [XI]WO2013178746 (SAUDI BASIC IND CORP [SA], et al) [X] 1-13 * figure -; example -; claim - * [I] 14; | [E]WO2015071396 (SAUDI BASIC IND CORP [SA], et al) [E] 1-14 * the whole document * |