EP3114016 - CRAWLER VEHICLE DRIVE SYSTEM AND CRAWLER VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH A DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRINOTH S.p.A. Via Brennero, 34 Vipiteno (BZ) / IT | [2017/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRCHMAIR, Martin Haslachsiedlung 33 A-6143 Pfons / AT | 02 /
MAURER, Gregor c/o PRINOTH S.p.A. Via Brennero, 34 39049 Vipiteno / IT | 03 /
RUNGGALDIER, Martin Plesdinaz 13 I-39047 St. Christina / IT | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | Eccetto, Mauro, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2017/02] | Application number, filing date | 15715828.8 | 04.03.2015 | [2017/02] | WO2015IB51584 | Priority number, date | IT2014MI00334 | 04.03.2014 Original published format: IT MI20140334 | [2017/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015132741 | Date: | 11.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3114016 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3114016 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/06, B62D55/112, B62D55/12, B62D55/14, B62D55/26, E01H4/02, B62D55/24, B62D55/27, B62D55/30 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
B62D55/244 (EP,US);
B62D55/06 (US);
B62D55/112 (US);
B62D55/12 (US);
B62D55/14 (US);
B62D55/24 (RU);
B62D55/26 (US);
B62D55/27 (EP,US);
B62D55/305 (EP,US);
E01H4/02 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/25 (US);
B60Y2200/41 (US);
B60Y2400/48 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | B62D55/24, B62D55/27, B62D55/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAUPENFAHRZEUGANTRIEBSSYSTEM UND RAUPENFAHRZEUG MIT SOLCH EINEM ANTRIEBSSYSTEM | [2017/02] | English: | CRAWLER VEHICLE DRIVE SYSTEM AND CRAWLER VEHICLE COMPRISING SUCH A DRIVE SYSTEM | [2017/02] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE VÉHICULE À CHENILLES ET VÉHICULE À CHENILLES COMPRENANT UN TEL SYSTÈME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2017/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/02] | 19.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2015 | AL | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | DK | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | NL | 01.08.2018 | PL | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | NO | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | PT | 01.12.2018 | GB | 04.03.2019 | IE | 04.03.2019 | LU | 04.03.2019 | MT | 04.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 04.03.2015 | |
AL | 01.08.2018 | ||
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 04.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
MT | 04.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CY | 01.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 04.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
MT | 04.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
PT | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 04.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
MT | 04.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 04.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
GB | 04.03.2019 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2019 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
DK | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
PL | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NL | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
NO | 01.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XAYI]US2013147262 (PAQUET FRANCOIS [CA]) [X] 1,2,4 * Fig.1,2,12,13a - pos.62(1), 62(2),63,64; paragraphs [0007] - [0089]; figure -; claim - * [A] 3,5-7 [Y] 8-12 [I] 13; | [XAYI]CA2430028 (FOREMOST IND INC [CA]) [X] 1,2,4 * Fig.2, Fig.4 pos.25,50,52; page 1, line 30 - page 12, line 9; figure -; claim - * [A] 3,5-7 [Y] 8-12 [I] 13; | [XYI]US5899164 (COAST JOHN B [US]) [X] 1-8 * Fig.6,pos.26,29,30; Fig.7 pos.53; column 2, line 50 - column 6, line 4; figure -; claim - * [Y] 9-12 [I] 13; | [XYI]JPH02286476 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4 * the whole document * [Y] 8-12 [I] 13; | [IY]US3754798 (CHAUMMONT G) [I] 1,2 * Fig.3; column 1, line 36 - column 4, line 15; figure -; claim - * [Y] 3; | [Y]GB2304395 (POWADA FREDERICK [GB]) [Y] 3,7 * Fig.1; page 1, line 17 - page 5, line 8; figure -; claim - *; | [Y]EP1279482 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 3,7 * the whole document *; | [Y]IT1234428 (LEITNER SPA [IT]) [Y] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPS6157474 (ISEKI AGRICULT MACH) [Y] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO2014008370 (MTD PRODUCTS INC [US]) [Y] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2009195061 (BELLEMARE MARTIN [CA]) [Y] 8-12 * the whole document *; | [XYI]US6264294 (MUSSELMAN JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,13 * Fig.4 pos.28,90; column 1, line 44 - column 12, line 19; figure -; claim - * [Y] 3,7,10-12 [I] 8,9; | [X]US2007052292 (MUSSELMAN ROBERT S [US]) [X] 1 * Fig.1 pos.; paragraphs [0006] - [0032]; figure -; claim - * | by applicant | DE10320523 | EP2285651 |