EP3129759 - DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE FREQUENCY OF VIBRATIONS ON A TIGHT DRIVE BELT, AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING THE VIBRATION FREQUENCY MEASUREMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hartmann, Jürgen In den Osterwiesen 5 88138 Sigmarszell / DE | [2017/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUHN, Jochen Kufsteinerstrasse 11 83080 Oberaudorf / DE | [2017/07] | Representative(s) | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/07] | Riebling, Peter Patentanwalt Postfach 31 60 88113 Lindau / DE | Application number, filing date | 15715980.7 | 28.03.2015 | [2017/07] | WO2015EP00668 | Priority number, date | DE20141005107 | 08.04.2014 Original published format: DE102014005107 | [2017/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015154857 | Date: | 15.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3129759 | Date: | 15.02.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3129759 | Date: | 18.07.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01H9/00, G01S7/40, G01S13/86, G01S13/88, G01S13/50 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
G01H9/00 (EP,CN,US);
G01S13/50 (EP,US);
G01S13/86 (EP,US);
G01S13/88 (EP,US);
G01S7/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/07] | G01H9/00, B23Q17/09, G01S13/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHWINGUNGSFREQUENZMESSUNG EINES GESPANNTEN ANTRIEBSRIEMENS UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DER SCHWINGUNGSFREQUENZMESSUNG | [2017/07] | English: | DEVICE FOR MEASURING THE FREQUENCY OF VIBRATIONS ON A TIGHT DRIVE BELT, AND METHOD FOR PERFORMING THE VIBRATION FREQUENCY MEASUREMENT | [2017/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA MESURE DE LA FRÉQUENCE D'OSCILLATION D'UNE COURROIE DE TRANSMISSION TENDUE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'EXÉCUTION DE LA MESURE DE FRÉQUENCE D'OSCILLATION | [2017/07] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/07] | 15.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2015 | AL | 18.07.2018 | CY | 18.07.2018 | CZ | 18.07.2018 | DK | 18.07.2018 | EE | 18.07.2018 | ES | 18.07.2018 | FI | 18.07.2018 | HR | 18.07.2018 | LT | 18.07.2018 | LV | 18.07.2018 | MC | 18.07.2018 | MK | 18.07.2018 | MT | 18.07.2018 | NL | 18.07.2018 | PL | 18.07.2018 | RO | 18.07.2018 | RS | 18.07.2018 | SE | 18.07.2018 | SI | 18.07.2018 | SK | 18.07.2018 | SM | 18.07.2018 | TR | 18.07.2018 | BG | 18.10.2018 | NO | 18.10.2018 | GR | 19.10.2018 | IS | 18.11.2018 | PT | 18.11.2018 | IE | 28.03.2019 | LU | 28.03.2019 | BE | 31.03.2019 | CH | 31.03.2019 | LI | 31.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.03.2015 | |
AL | 18.07.2018 | ||
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CY | 18.07.2018 | ||
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
MT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
PT | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
TR | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
BE | 31.03.2019 | ||
CH | 31.03.2019 | ||
LI | 31.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
IE | 28.03.2019 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
LU | 28.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
MC | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SI | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
DK | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
SM | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
EE | 18.07.2018 | ||
ES | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
SK | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
CZ | 18.07.2018 | ||
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RO | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 18.07.2018 | |
FI | 18.07.2018 | ||
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
LV | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
HR | 18.07.2018 | ||
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
PL | 18.07.2018 | ||
RS | 18.07.2018 | ||
SE | 18.07.2018 | ||
BG | 18.10.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
GR | 19.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 18.07.2018 | |
LT | 18.07.2018 | ||
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
NO | 18.10.2018 | ||
IS | 18.11.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 18.07.2018 | |
NL | 18.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | NL | 18.07.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0316888 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 13 * * column 4, lines 6-53 * * column 5, lines 4-28 *; | [I]DE4235072 (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE [DE]) [I] 1-9 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 16 *; | [Y]GB2310099 (MECON LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I]US2003058158 (SMITH KIMBLE J [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0013] , [0014] , [0033] * * claim 1 *; | [A]US2012031187 (BOHN GUNTHER [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2014052280 (ACT DENSHI KK) [A] 1-9* the whole document * |