EP3120257 - NAMED ENTITTY PLATFORM AND STORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUCERZAN, Silviu-Petru c/o Microsoft Corporation LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | Sparrow, Gemma Lesley, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 15716204.1 | 13.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US20313 | Priority number, date | US201414218678 | 18.03.2014 Original published format: US201414218678 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142626 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120257 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27, G10L15/00, G06F17/30, G06Q10/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0251 (EP,CN);
G06F40/295 (EP,CN);
G06F16/9035 (US);
G10L15/1822 (EP,CN,US);
G10L15/22 (EP,CN,US);
G10L2015/088 (EP,CN,US);
G10L2015/226 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | BENANNTE ENTITTÄTSPLATTFORM UND SPEICHER | [2017/04] | English: | NAMED ENTITTY PLATFORM AND STORE | [2017/04] | French: | PLATE-FORME D'ENTITÉ NOMMÉE ET MÉMOIRE | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.01.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.09.2020 | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32] | 06.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 03.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2014032529 (CHANG WALTER [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0016] , [0017] , [0020] , [0021] , [0025] - [0037]; figure 2 *; | [A]WO2006108061 (IVERSITY THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES [US], et al) [A] 1,3-5 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0011] *; | [A]CN103309926 (CHINESE ACAD INST ACOUSTICS, et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0002]; claim 1 *; | [A]US2007088696 (KATARIYA SANJEEV [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * paragraph [0021] * | [I] - SILVIU CUCERZAN, "The MSR System for Entity Linking at TAC 2012", TAC 2012, (2012), XP055194474 [I] 1-10 * Sections 1 and 2 * | Examination | - CUCERZAN S, "Large-Scale Named Entity Disambiguation Based on Wikipedia Data", PROCEEDINGS OF THE JOINT CONFERENCE OF EMPIRICAL METHODS INNATURAL LANGUAGE PROCESSING AND VERY LARGE CORPORA, XX, XX, (20070601), pages 708 - 716, XP002514222 | - SILVIU CUCERZAN, "TAC Entity Linking by Performing Full-document Entity Extraction and Disambiguation", TAC 2011, (20110101), XP055634217 | by applicant | US8112402 |