EP3126927 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZING PERFORMANCE OF A PCD WHILE MITIGATING THERMAL GENERATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.09.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.06.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMAN, Vijay 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
DERBYSHIRE, Amy 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 03 /
MEDRANO, Christopher 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 04 /
MATHEW, Shiju Abraham 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 05 /
ALTON, Ronald Frank 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 06 /
ANDERSON, Jon James 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Hohgardt, Martin Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15716353.6 | 31.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US23638 | Priority number, date | US201461973772P | 01.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461973772 P | US201414289675 | 29.05.2014 Original published format: US201414289675 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015153643 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126927 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3126927 | Date: | 30.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/324, G06F1/20, G06F1/3203 | [2019/27] | CPC: |
G06F1/206 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G05B11/42 (KR,US);
G06F1/203 (US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/324 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F1/3296 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/06] | G06F1/20, G06F1/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER LEISTUNG EINER TRAGBAREN COMPUTERVORRICHTUNG (PCD) BEI VERRINGERUNG DER WÄRMEERZEUGUNG | [2017/06] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR OPTIMIZING PERFORMANCE OF A PCD WHILE MITIGATING THERMAL GENERATION | [2017/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR OPTIMISER LES PERFORMANCES D'UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE PORTATIF TOUT EN ATTÉNUANT LA PRODUCTION THERMIQUE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.05.2019 | 22.05.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 17.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.03.2015 | AL | 30.10.2019 | AT | 30.10.2019 | CY | 30.10.2019 | CZ | 30.10.2019 | DK | 30.10.2019 | EE | 30.10.2019 | ES | 30.10.2019 | FI | 30.10.2019 | HR | 30.10.2019 | IT | 30.10.2019 | LT | 30.10.2019 | LV | 30.10.2019 | MC | 30.10.2019 | MK | 30.10.2019 | MT | 30.10.2019 | NL | 30.10.2019 | PL | 30.10.2019 | RO | 30.10.2019 | RS | 30.10.2019 | SE | 30.10.2019 | SI | 30.10.2019 | SK | 30.10.2019 | SM | 30.10.2019 | TR | 30.10.2019 | BG | 30.01.2020 | NO | 30.01.2020 | GR | 31.01.2020 | IS | 29.02.2020 | PT | 02.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | IE | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | LU | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 31.03.2015 | |
AL | 30.10.2019 | ||
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CY | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
MT | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
TR | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
LU | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
LU | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
IE | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
LU | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
LU | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
AT | 30.10.2019 | ||
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
MC | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SI | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
IT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
SK | 30.10.2019 | ||
SM | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
DK | 30.10.2019 | ||
EE | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
CZ | 30.10.2019 | ||
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RO | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
ES | 30.10.2019 | ||
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 30.10.2019 | |
FI | 30.10.2019 | ||
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
HR | 30.10.2019 | ||
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
RS | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
IS | 29.02.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
LV | 30.10.2019 | ||
NL | 30.10.2019 | ||
PL | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
GR | 31.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 30.10.2019 | |
LT | 30.10.2019 | ||
SE | 30.10.2019 | ||
BG | 30.01.2020 | ||
NO | 30.01.2020 | ||
PT | 02.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 30.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007156370 (WHITE SCOTT A [US], et al) [I] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0092] * * figures 2A-7 *; | [XI]US2013328890 (AVKAROGULLARI GOKHAN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10,11,13-17,19,20,22-25,27-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 1-5,8,9 * [I] 3,9,12,18,21,26,30; | [I] - JINMING YUE ET AL, "Thermal-Aware Feedback Control Scheduling for Soft Real-time Systems", HIGH PERFORMANCE COMPUTING AND COMMUNICATION&2012 IEEE 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON EMBEDDED SOFTWARE AND SYSTEMS (HPCC-ICESS), 2012 IEEE 14TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, (20120625), doi:10.1109/HPCC.2012.216, ISBN 978-1-4673-2164-8, pages 1479 - 1486, XP032255448 [I] 1,2,4-6,10,11,13-15,19,20,22-25,27-29 * abstract * * I. Introduction - VI. TAFCS Algorithm * * figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HPCC.2012.216 | Examination | US2009006901 | US2013035797 |