EP3119726 - TRANSPARENT SOUND ABSORBING PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORRELLI, Nicholas Francis 935 West Water Street Elmira, New York 14905 / US | 02 /
SHI, Zhiqiang 7 Argila Lane Shrewsbury, Massachusetts 01545 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | Greene, Simon Kenneth Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15716911.1 | 18.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015US21143 | Priority number, date | US201461968135P | 20.03.2014 Original published format: US 201461968135 P | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015142978 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119726 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/095, C03C4/08, C03C4/04, C03C11/00, C03C10/00, C03C15/00, C03C23/00, E01F8/00, E04B9/00, E04B9/04 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
C03C3/095 (EP,CN,US);
C03C10/0027 (EP,CN,US);
E04B1/84 (CN,US);
C03C15/00 (EP,CN,US);
C03C23/002 (EP,CN,US);
C03C23/007 (EP,CN,US);
C03C4/04 (EP,CN,US);
E04B1/82 (US);
E04B9/001 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | TRANSPARENTE SCHALLABSORBIERENDE PLATTEN | [2017/04] | English: | TRANSPARENT SOUND ABSORBING PANELS | [2017/04] | French: | PANNEAUX D'ABSORPTION SONORE TRANSPARENTS | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 20.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/45] | 06.07.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4315759 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-34* the whole document *; | [XYI]JP2007262765 (YAMAHA CORP) [X] 1-5,8,10,14-18,20,21,23-28,30,31,33,34 * abstract * * paragraphs [0022] - [0028] - [0047] - [0059] * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 11,19,29 [I] 6,7,9,12,13,22,32; | [Y] - KHALID HASAN TANTAWI ET AL, "Structural and composition analysis of Apex(TM) and Foturan(TM) photodefinable glasses", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS SCIENCE, (20130326), vol. 48, no. 15, doi:10.1007/s10853-013-7326-5, ISSN 0022-2461, pages 5316 - 5323, XP055210108 [Y] 11,19,29 * the whole document * * especially sections "Introduction" and "Experimental procedure" and table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10853-013-7326-5 |