EP3134361 - REGENERATIVE FURNACE OPERATION WITH AN OXIDANT COMPRISING 60 TO 85 PERCENT OF OXYGEN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2020 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Praxair Technology, Inc. 10 Riverview Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2019/30] |
Former [2019/17] | For all designated states Praxair Technology Inc. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810 / US | ||
Former [2017/09] | For all designated states Praxair Technology Inc. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IYOHA, Osemwengie Uyi 297 Schoelles Road Amherst, NY 14228 / US | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstraße 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [2019/17] |
Former [2017/09] | Schwan Schorer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15716962.4 | 06.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015US24433 | Priority number, date | US201461983854P | 24.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461983854 P | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015164053 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134361 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3134361 | Date: | 24.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03B5/235, F23L7/00, F23L15/00, F23L15/02 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
F23L7/007 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03B5/2353 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F23L15/00 (CN);
F23L15/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F27D17/004 (EP,CN,US);
F27D2017/007 (EP,CN,US);
F27D2019/0043 (KR);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US);
Y02P10/122 (EP,US);
Y02P40/50 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REGENERATIVOFENBETRIEB MIT OXIDATIONSMITTEL MIT 60 BIS 85 PROZENT SAUERSTOFF | [2017/09] | English: | REGENERATIVE FURNACE OPERATION WITH AN OXIDANT COMPRISING 60 TO 85 PERCENT OF OXYGEN | [2017/09] | French: | FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN FOUR À RÉGÉNÉRATEURS À L'AIDE D'UN OXYDANT COMPRENANT 60 À 85 POURCENT D'OXYGÈNE | [2018/41] |
Former [2017/09] | FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN FOUR DE RÉGÉNÉRATION À L'AIDE D'UN OXYDANT COMPRENANT 60 À 85 POUR CENT D'OXYGÈNE | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 13.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.04.2015 | AL | 24.04.2019 | AT | 24.04.2019 | CY | 24.04.2019 | CZ | 24.04.2019 | DK | 24.04.2019 | EE | 24.04.2019 | FI | 24.04.2019 | HR | 24.04.2019 | LT | 24.04.2019 | LV | 24.04.2019 | MC | 24.04.2019 | MK | 24.04.2019 | MT | 24.04.2019 | PL | 24.04.2019 | RO | 24.04.2019 | RS | 24.04.2019 | SE | 24.04.2019 | SI | 24.04.2019 | SK | 24.04.2019 | SM | 24.04.2019 | TR | 24.04.2019 | BG | 24.07.2019 | NO | 24.07.2019 | GR | 25.07.2019 | IS | 24.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 06.04.2015 | |
AL | 24.04.2019 | ||
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CY | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
MT | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
MC | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SI | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
TR | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
SM | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
EE | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
SK | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
AT | 24.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RO | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
CZ | 24.04.2019 | ||
DK | 24.04.2019 | ||
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
IS | 24.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
PL | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
BG | 24.07.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
LV | 24.04.2019 | ||
RS | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
GR | 25.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 24.04.2019 | |
FI | 24.04.2019 | ||
HR | 24.04.2019 | ||
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
SE | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 24.04.2019 | |
LT | 24.04.2019 | ||
NO | 24.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4725299 (KHINKIS MARK J [US], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, lines 58-62; figure 1; claim 12 * * column 4, lines 11-14,43-64 *; | [A]EP0928938 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]) [A] 1-11* paragraphs [0014] - [0022] - [0038]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US6159003 (DUBOUDIN THIERRY [FR], et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 2, lines 6-10; figure 1; claim 1 * * column 3, lines 1-24; example 1 * * column 4, lines 28-32 *; | [A]US2010199722 (GALLEY DAVID [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0026] - [0037]; figures 3,5 *; | [A]JP2013170741 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0048] , [0099]; figures 1-5 * |