EP3126301 - OPAQUE COLORED GLASS-CERAMICS COMPRISING NEPHELINE CRYSTAL PHASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.10.2023 [2023/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ELLISON, Adam James 70 E. 5th Street Corning, New York 14830 / US | 02 /
MOORE, Lisa Anne 7 West 4th Street Corning, New York 14830 / US | 03 /
WERNER, Taheisha Linette 2657 Goff Road Corning, New York 14830 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Postfach 20 07 34 80007 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Scott, Mark Andrew Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15717067.1 | 02.04.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US23978 | Priority number, date | US201461975322P | 04.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461975322 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015153829 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126301 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/085, C03C4/02, C03C10/10 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
C03C10/0018 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C3/085 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03B32/02 (CN,KR,US);
C03C21/002 (CN,KR,US);
C03C4/02 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C2204/04 (EP,CN,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | UNDURCHSICHTIGE GEFÄRBTE GLASKERAMIK MIT NEPHELINKRISTALLPHASEN | [2017/06] | English: | OPAQUE COLORED GLASS-CERAMICS COMPRISING NEPHELINE CRYSTAL PHASES | [2017/06] | French: | VITROCÉRAMIQUES OPAQUES COLORÉES COMPRENANT DES PHASES CRISTALLINES DE NÉPHÉLINE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/43] | 21.06.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division and information on prior art not received in time [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2023 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3146114 (KIVLIGHN HERBERT D) [X] 1,5,6,9,11,15,17-20 * column 7, line 68 - column 8, line 36; examples 32,33,35-76; claim 2; tables I-III * [I] 2-4,7,8,12-14,16; | [XI]US3528828 (SMITH WILLIAM EARL) [X] 1,5,6,9,11,15,17-20 * column 4, line 16 - column 5, line 8; example 19; table III * [I] 2-4,7,8,12-14,16; | [XI]US3720526 (DUKE D, et al) [X] 1,5,6,9-11,15,17-21 * column 2, line 41 - column 12, line 35; example 25; claims 1-2 * [I] 2-4,7,8,12-14,16; | [XI]US4022627 (TASHIRO MEGUMI, et al) [X] 1,5,6,9,11,15,17-20 * the whole document * [I] 2-4,7,8,12-14,16; | [XI]JP2002265234 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1,5,6,9,11,15,17-19 * paragraph [0035]; example 2; claims 1-7 * [I] 2-4,7,8,12-14,16; | [X]US2013224491 (SMEDSKJAER MORTEN MATTRUP [US], et al) [X] 1,5,9-11,21* examples 31-33 * |