EP3126917 - RUNTIME CONTROLLER FOR ROBOTIC MANUFACTURING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 26.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PL, PT, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intrinsic Innovation LLC 100 Mayfield Avenue Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2022/04] |
Former [2021/41] | For all designated states Intrinsic Innovation LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | ||
Former [2018/20] | For all designated states X Development LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | ||
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Bot & Dolly LLC 150 Mississippi Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINNELL, Jeffrey 150 Mississippi Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 02 /
BYRNE, Kendra 150 Mississippi Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | 03 /
BITTERMAN, Matthew 150 Mississippi Street San Francisco, CA 94107 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Varley, James Richard, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/51] |
Former [2017/06] | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15717719.7 | 30.03.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015US23359 | Priority number, date | US201414242840 | 01.04.2014 Original published format: US201414242840 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015153467 | Date: | 08.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126917 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3126917 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/409, G05B19/42 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
G05B19/409 (EP,US);
G05B19/42 (EP,US);
G05B2219/36056 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39432 (EP,US);
G05B2219/39443 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAUFZEITSTEUERGERÄT FÜR ROBOTISCHES HERSTELLUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/06] | English: | RUNTIME CONTROLLER FOR ROBOTIC MANUFACTURING SYSTEM | [2017/06] | French: | UNITÉ DE COMMANDE D'EXÉCUTION POUR SYSTÈME DE FABRICATION ROBOTIQUE | [2017/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2016 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 27.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.12.2023 | CZ | 20.12.2023 | EE | 20.12.2023 | ES | 20.12.2023 | FI | 20.12.2023 | HR | 20.12.2023 | IT | 20.12.2023 | LT | 20.12.2023 | LV | 20.12.2023 | NL | 20.12.2023 | PL | 20.12.2023 | RO | 20.12.2023 | RS | 20.12.2023 | SE | 20.12.2023 | SK | 20.12.2023 | SM | 20.12.2023 | BG | 20.03.2024 | NO | 20.03.2024 | GR | 21.03.2024 | IS | 20.04.2024 | PT | 22.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | AT | 20.12.2023 | |
CZ | 20.12.2023 | ||
EE | 20.12.2023 | ||
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RO | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | EE | 20.12.2023 | |
ES | 20.12.2023 | ||
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
SM | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
IS | 20.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
LV | 20.12.2023 | ||
NL | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 20.12.2023 | |
FI | 20.12.2023 | ||
HR | 20.12.2023 | ||
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
RS | 20.12.2023 | ||
SE | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
NO | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | FI | 20.12.2023 | |
LT | 20.12.2023 | ||
BG | 20.03.2024 | ||
GR | 21.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 21.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4140953 (DUNNE MAURICE J) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [XI]US4420812 (ITO YOSHIMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,19,20 * figure 3a * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 4 * * column 19, line 21 - column 20, line 19 * [I] 12-18; | [A]US5937143 (WATANABE ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [I]US5949683 (AKAMI YUSUKE [JP], et al) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1145804 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [I]EP1710644 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [I] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010025768 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2010045968 (ABB TECHNOLOGY AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | Examination | US2006178778 | EP1716983 |