EP3281330 - MEASUREMENT GAP CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2023 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.09.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REIAL, Andres Barometergatan 44 S-211 17 Malmö / SE | 02 /
ALRIKSSON, Peter Fridagatan 10 S-242 31 Hörby / SE | 03 /
LINDOFF, Bengt Öresundsvägen 5 S-237 35 Bjärred / SE | 04 /
AXMON, Joakim Poppelvägen 20 S-244 41 Kävlinge / SE | [2018/07] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 15718455.7 | 08.04.2015 | [2018/07] | WO2015EP57590 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016162057 | Date: | 13.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3281330 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04W48/16 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
H04L1/1896 (EP,CN,US);
H04L1/1864 (EP,CN,US);
H04W48/12 (US);
H04W56/001 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W48/16 (EP,CN,US);
H04W56/0065 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/07] | Title | German: | MESSLÜCKENKONFIGURATION | [2018/07] | English: | MEASUREMENT GAP CONFIGURATION | [2018/07] | French: | CONFIGURATION D'INTERVALLE DE MESURE | [2018/07] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2017 | Examination requested [2018/07] | 26.10.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/10] | 03.11.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2023/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]WO2013104129 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [Y] 1-18,20-43,45-49 * abstract * * figures 2, 3a, 5 * * page 11, line 13 - page 13, line 26 * [A] 19,44; | [YA]WO2015018025 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [Y] 1-18,20-43,45-49 * abstract * * figure 5 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0 40] * [A] 19,44; | [A]WO2015023222 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-49 * abstract * * figures 4, 5 ** page 37, line 18 - page 41, line 7 * |