EP3134082 - MODIFICATION OF EXTRACORPOREAL PHOTOPHERESIS TECHNOLOGY WITH PORPHYRIN PRECURSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oslo Universitetssykehus HF Sognsvannsveien 20 0372 Oslo / NO | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PENG, Qian Baerumsveien 24B N-0284 Oslo / NO | 02 /
WARLOE, Trond Heggelibakken 6 0375 Oslo / NO | 03 /
NESLAND, Jahn M. Bleikerveien 61 1387 Asker / NO | 04 /
CHRISTENSEN, Eidi Merkurveien 11A 7036 Trondheim / NO | 05 /
GEDERAAS, Odrun Arna Værestranda 74 7054 Ranheim / NO | 06 /
HOLIEN, Toril Osvegen 19B 7054 Ranheim / NO | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/09] | 01 /
PENG, Qian Baerumsveien 24B N-0284 Oslo / NO | Representative(s) | Zacco GmbH Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 15718489.6 | 24.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015EP58986 | Priority number, date | GB20140007296 | 24.04.2014 Original published format: GB 201407296 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015162279 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134082 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3134082 | Date: | 02.06.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/197, A61K41/00, A61K31/22, A61P35/02, A61P37/02 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/197 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/409 (GB);
A61K35/14 (US);
A61K31/195 (GB);
A61K31/22 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/37 (GB);
A61K41/0061 (EP,KR,US);
A61K41/0066 (US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MODIFIKATION DER EXTRAKORPORALEN PHOTOPHERESE TECHNOLOGIE MIT PORPHYRIN-VORLÄUFERN | [2020/52] | English: | MODIFICATION OF EXTRACORPOREAL PHOTOPHERESIS TECHNOLOGY WITH PORPHYRIN PRECURSORS | [2017/09] | French: | MODIFICATION DE LA PHOTOPHÉRÈSE EXTRACORPORELLE AVEC LES PRÉCURSEURS DE LA PORPHYRINE | [2020/52] |
Former [2017/09] | MODIFIZIERUNG VON EXTRAKORPORALER PHOTOPHERESETECHNOLOGIE MIT PORPHYRINVORLÄUFERN | ||
Former [2017/09] | MODIFICATION DE LA TECHNOLOGIE DE PHOTOPHÉRÈSE EXTRACORPORELLE À L'AIDE DE PRÉCURSEURS DE PORPHYRINE | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 18.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.04.2015 | AL | 02.06.2021 | AT | 02.06.2021 | CY | 02.06.2021 | CZ | 02.06.2021 | DK | 02.06.2021 | EE | 02.06.2021 | FI | 02.06.2021 | HR | 02.06.2021 | LT | 02.06.2021 | LV | 02.06.2021 | MC | 02.06.2021 | MK | 02.06.2021 | NL | 02.06.2021 | PL | 02.06.2021 | RO | 02.06.2021 | RS | 02.06.2021 | SE | 02.06.2021 | SI | 02.06.2021 | SK | 02.06.2021 | SM | 02.06.2021 | TR | 02.06.2021 | BG | 02.09.2021 | NO | 02.09.2021 | GR | 03.09.2021 | IS | 02.10.2021 | PT | 04.10.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 24.04.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
MK | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 24.04.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CY | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 24.04.2015 | |
AL | 02.06.2021 | ||
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2023/06] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
MC | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SI | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 02.06.2021 | |
AT | 02.06.2021 | ||
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
DK | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
EE | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
IS | 02.10.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
CZ | 02.06.2021 | ||
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RO | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SK | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
PT | 04.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 02.06.2021 | |
FI | 02.06.2021 | ||
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
NL | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
SM | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
PL | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
RS | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
HR | 02.06.2021 | ||
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
LV | 02.06.2021 | ||
SE | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
NO | 02.09.2021 | ||
GR | 03.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | ||
BG | 02.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 02.06.2021 | |
LT | 02.06.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XPI] - CUNDERLÍKOVÁ B ET AL, "Modification of extracorporeal photopheresis technology with porphyrin precursors. Comparison between 8-methoxypsoralen and hexaminolevulinate in killing human T-cell lymphoma cell lines in vitro", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA (BBA) - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20140608), vol. 1840, no. 9, doi:10.1016/J.BBAGEN.2014.05.020, ISSN 0304-4165, pages 2702 - 2708, XP029015600 [XP] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 5 * [I] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbagen.2014.05.020 | [Y] - DAVID M. WARD, "Extracorporeal photopheresis: How, when, and why", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL APHERESIS, (20110101), vol. 26, no. 5, doi:10.1002/jca.20300, ISSN 0733-2459, pages 276 - 285, XP055198103 [Y] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jca.20300 | [Y] - SUSAN SHAHZIDI ET AL, "Simultaneously targeting mitochondria and endoplasmic reticulum by photodynamic therapy induces apoptosis in human lymphoma cells", PHOTOCHEMICAL & PHOTOBIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (20110101), vol. 10, no. 11, doi:10.1039/c1pp05169e, ISSN 1474-905X, page 1773, XP055198088 [Y] 1-15 * paragraph entitled "1 Introduction"; paragraph entitled "2.4 Photodynamic treatment with HAL"; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/c1pp05169e | [A] - QIAN PENG, "Editorial: Photodynamic Therapy and Detection", JOURNAL OF ENVIRONMENTAL PATHOLOGY, TOXICOLOGY AND ONCOLOGY, (20060101), vol. 25, no. 1-2, doi:10.1615/JEnvironPatholToxicolOncol.v25.i1-2.10, ISSN 0731-8898, pages 1 - 6, XP055198212 [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 1-14 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1615/JEnvironPatholToxicolOncol.v25.i1-2.10 | [Y] - N F GAMALEIA, "Sensitivity of normal and malignant human lymphocytes to 5-aminolevulinic acidmediated photodynamic damage", EXP ONCOL, (20080301), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 65 - 69, XP055198270 [Y] 1-15 * table 1-3 * | [Y] - H.PETER VAN IPEREN ET AL, "Singlet oxygen producing photosensitizers in photophoresis", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY B: BIOLOGY, (19970401), vol. 38, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/S1011-1344(96)07442-8, ISSN 1011-1344, pages 203 - 208, XP055197966 [Y] 1-15 * abstract; table 1 and 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1011-1344(96)07442-8 | Examination | EP0196515 | US5030200 | FR2696756 | WO2005004862 | - Zale P Bernstein, "Photopheresis in HIV-1 Infected Patients (Pt) Using Benzoporphyrin Derivative (BPD-MA) Induces Apoptosis in CD4 Cells, Increases Cytolytic T-Cell Activity, Intracellular Expression of Chemokines, and Decreases HIV Infectivity and Viral Load.", Blood, (20060101), vol. 108, no. 11, XP055197891 | - BERNSTEIN ZALE P ET AL, "Photopheresis in HIV-1 infected patients using Benzoporphyrin derivative (BPD-MA) and light induces apoptosis in CD4 cells and decreases HIV infectivity", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (20011116), Database accession no. PREV200200241389 | - BLOOD, 43RD ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, PART 1; ORLANDO, FLORIDA, USA; DECEMBER 07-11, 2001, (20011116), vol. 98, no. 11 Part 1, ISSN 0006-4971, page 508a |