EP3126641 - METHOD FOR HEATING OR MAINTAINING THE TEMPERATURE OF A STEAM TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/06] | METHOD FOR HEATING UP A STEAM TURBINE OR FOR KEEPING A STEAM TURBINE HOT | ||
[2021/10] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2021 [2021/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Energy Global GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2021/04] |
Former [2017/35] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOGEN, Tobias Von-Einem-Strasse 30 45130 Essen / DE | 02 /
KOSTENKO, Yevgen Altdorferstrasse 18 40878 Ratingen / DE | 03 /
ZAHN, Sebastian Friedrich-Wilhelm-Strasse 69 47051 Duisburg / DE | 04 /
ZANDER, Uwe Denkhauser Höfe 196 e 45475 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 15719220.4 | 29.04.2015 | [2017/06] | WO2015EP59276 | Priority number, date | EP20140171101 | 04.06.2014 Original published format: EP 14171101 | [2017/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015185292 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3126641 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F01K13/02, F01D25/10 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
F01D25/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F01K13/02 (RU,US);
F01K13/025 (EP,CN,KR,US);
F01K7/16 (US);
F05D2220/31 (US);
F05D2220/74 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ANWÄRMEN ODER WARMHALTEN EINER DAMPFTURBINE | [2017/06] | English: | METHOD FOR HEATING OR MAINTAINING THE TEMPERATURE OF A STEAM TURBINE | [2021/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CHAUFFAGE OU DE MAINTIEN À TEMPÉRATURE POUR UNE TURBINE À VAPEUR | [2021/10] |
Former [2017/06] | METHOD FOR HEATING UP A STEAM TURBINE OR FOR KEEPING A STEAM TURBINE HOT | ||
Former [2017/06] | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉCHAUFFAGE OU DE MAINTIEN À TEMPÉRATURE D'UNE TURBINE À VAPEUR | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 06.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/52] | 10.08.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1191192 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US6405537 (WADA NORIHISA [JP], et al); | [A]DE102010042405 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | by applicant | DE607273 |