EP3186725 - USER INTERFACE FOR GENERATING SEARCH QUERIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.10.2020 [2020/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052 / US | [2018/21] |
Former [2017/27] | For all designated states LinkedIn Corporation 1000 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085-2810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHOUP, Matthew David 1000 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085-2810 / US | 02 /
SO, Kathleen Susan 1000 West Maude Avenue Sunnyvale, California 94085-2810 / US | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/27] | Collins, John David, et al Schwegman Lundberg Woessner Ltd. Hillington Park Innovation Centre 1 Ainslie Road Glasgow G52 4RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15719324.4 | 24.03.2015 | [2017/27] | WO2015US22325 | Priority number, date | US201462044167P | 29.08.2014 Original published format: US 201462044167 P | US201414582103 | 23.12.2014 Original published format: US201414582103 | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016032571 | Date: | 03.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3186725 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
G06F16/2428 (EP,US);
G06F16/951 (US);
G06F16/24537 (EP,US);
G06F16/3341 (EP,US);
G06F16/35 (EP,US);
G06F16/90344 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Title | German: | BENUTZEROBERFLÄCHE ZUR ERSTELLUNG VON SUCHANFRAGEN | [2017/27] | English: | USER INTERFACE FOR GENERATING SEARCH QUERIES | [2017/27] | French: | INTERFACE UTILISATEUR POUR GÉNÉRER DES INTERROGATIONS DE RECHERCHE | [2017/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 28.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5175814 (ANICK PETER G [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract * * column 7, line 30 - column 17, line 43 ** column 18, lines 52-65 *; | [XI]US2002059297 (SCHIRMER ANDREW [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-8,12,14,15,18,19,21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0016] * * paragraphs [0020] - [0044] * [I] 3,4,9-11,13,16,17,20 |