EP3123033 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE HYDRAULIC OPERATING POINT OF A PUMP ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WILO SE Nortkirchenstrasse 100 44263 Dortmund / DE | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDERS, Tilman Philip, Prof.Dr.-Ing. c/o WILO SE Nortkirchenstrasse 100 44263 Dortmund / DE | 02 /
FIEDLER, Jens Olav, Dr. c/o WILO SE Nortkirchenstrasse 100 44263 Dortmund / DE | [2019/52] |
Former [2017/05] | 01 /
SANDERS, Tilmann Phönixstraße 27 44263 Dortmund / DE | ||
02 /
FIEDLER, Jens Zum Mühlenheck 21 44225 Dortmund / DE | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR Schumannstraße 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/05] | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 15719612.2 | 26.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015EP00642 | Priority number, date | DE20141004336 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014004336 | [2017/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015144310 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3123033 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3123033 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F04D15/00 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
F04D15/0088 (EP,CN,US);
F04D15/0066 (EP,CN,US);
F04D13/06 (US);
F04D1/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DES HYDRAULISCHEN ARBEITSPUNKTES EINES PUMPENAGGREGATS | [2017/05] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE HYDRAULIC OPERATING POINT OF A PUMP ASSEMBLY | [2017/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DU POINT DE FONCTIONNEMENT HYDRAULIQUE D'UN GROUPE MOTOPOMPE | [2017/05] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 28.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.03.2015 | AL | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | ES | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | NL | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SE | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | AT | 26.03.2020 | IE | 26.03.2020 | LU | 26.03.2020 | BE | 31.03.2020 | CH | 31.03.2020 | LI | 31.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 26.03.2015 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
AT | 26.03.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
AT | 26.03.2020 | ||
IE | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
BE | 31.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IE | 26.03.2020 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
CH | 31.03.2020 | ||
LI | 31.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
LU | 26.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
SE | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4108574 (BARTLEY THOMAS S, et al) [A] 1-22 * column 8, line 25 - line 59; figure 1 * * column 9, line 27 - line 45 * * column 10, line 9 - line 30 *; | [A]US2003129062 (SABINI EUGENE P [US], et al) [A] 1,9-11,21,22* paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2007212230 (STAVALE ANTHONY E [US], et al) [A] 1,9-11,21,22 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0019]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0034]; figure 4 *; | [A]WO2008096731 (NIDEC SHIBAURA CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1,9,21,22 * abstract *; | [A]EP2354556 (ABB OY [FI]) [A] 1,8-12,21,22 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0031]; figure 4 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038]; figure 5 *; | [A]EP2696175 (GRUNDFOS HOLDING AS [DK]) [A] 1,5,6,8-12,17,18,21,22 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0022] * |