EP3132001 - CHEMICALLY-INDUCED PULSED FRACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Saudi Arabian Oil Company 1 Eastern Avenue Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2017/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL-NAKHLI, Ayman, R. P.O. Box 12586 Saudi Aramco Dhahran 31311 / SA | 02 /
ABASS, Hazim, H. P.O. Box 12931 Saudi Aramco Dhahran 31311 / SA | 03 /
HILAB, Victor, V. P.O. Box 9003 Saudi Aramco Dhahran 31311 / SA | 04 /
KHAN, Mirajuddin, R. P.O. Box 10821 Saudi Aramco Dhahran 31311 / SA | 05 /
AL-OTAIBI, Ahmad, S. HB-210 Building 2291 Saudi Aramco Dhahran 31311 / SA | [2017/08] | Representative(s) | Cawley, Aimee Elizabeth, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2020/46] |
Former [2017/08] | Dauncey, Mark Peter Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 15720169.0 | 17.04.2015 | [2017/08] | WO2015US26402 | Priority number, date | US201461980664P | 17.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461980664 P | US201462017867P | 27.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462017867 P | [2017/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015161213 | Date: | 22.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3132001 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3132001 | Date: | 11.11.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/52, C09K8/592, C09K8/62, E21B43/24 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
C09K8/52 (EP,CN,US);
E21B43/26 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/62 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/665 (US);
C09K8/80 (US);
E21B43/267 (EP,CN,US);
C09K8/592 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CHEMISCH INDUZIERTES, GEPULSTES FRAKTURIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2017/08] | English: | CHEMICALLY-INDUCED PULSED FRACTURING METHOD | [2017/08] | French: | PROCEDE DE FRACTURATION PAR IMPULSION INDUITE CHIMIQUEMENT | [2017/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/08] | 04.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 12.08.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.04.2015 | AL | 11.11.2020 | AT | 11.11.2020 | CY | 11.11.2020 | CZ | 11.11.2020 | DK | 11.11.2020 | EE | 11.11.2020 | ES | 11.11.2020 | FI | 11.11.2020 | HR | 11.11.2020 | IT | 11.11.2020 | LT | 11.11.2020 | LV | 11.11.2020 | MC | 11.11.2020 | MK | 11.11.2020 | MT | 11.11.2020 | NL | 11.11.2020 | PL | 11.11.2020 | RO | 11.11.2020 | RS | 11.11.2020 | SE | 11.11.2020 | SI | 11.11.2020 | SK | 11.11.2020 | SM | 11.11.2020 | TR | 11.11.2020 | BG | 11.02.2021 | GR | 12.02.2021 | IS | 11.03.2021 | PT | 11.03.2021 | IE | 17.04.2021 | LU | 17.04.2021 | BE | 30.04.2021 | CH | 30.04.2021 | FR | 30.04.2021 | LI | 30.04.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 17.04.2015 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
TR | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 17.04.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 17.04.2015 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
MK | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 17.04.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 17.04.2015 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CY | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 17.04.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 17.04.2015 | |
AL | 11.11.2020 | ||
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 17.04.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 17.04.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
BE | 30.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 17.04.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
IE | 17.04.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
CH | 30.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
LI | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
FR | 30.04.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
LU | 17.04.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
ES | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
MC | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SI | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
IT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
NL | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 11.11.2020 | |
AT | 11.11.2020 | ||
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
DK | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
EE | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RO | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SK | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
CZ | 11.11.2020 | ||
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LT | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
SM | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
HR | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
PL | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
IS | 11.03.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 11.11.2020 | |
FI | 11.11.2020 | ||
LV | 11.11.2020 | ||
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
SE | 11.11.2020 | ||
BG | 11.02.2021 | ||
GR | 12.02.2021 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
RS | 11.11.2020 | ||
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 11.11.2020 | |
PT | 11.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 11.11.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4219083 (BERKSHIRE DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 9-11,14-16* claim 1; table 1 *; | [X]US4846277 (KHALIL CARLOS N [BR], et al) [X] 1-11,13-24 * column 1, lines 31-35; claim 1 * * column 6, lines 51-55 *; | [X]US5411093 (JENNINGS JR ALFRED R [US]) [X] 1,6-9,14-17,22-24 * column 2, lines 26-55; claims 8,11 *; | [X]US2012305255 (ZAVOLZHSKIY VICTOR BORISOVICH [RU], et al) [X] 1,6-9,14-17,22-24 * example 2; claims 12,13 *; | [X]US2013126175 (AL-MULHEM ABDULRAHMAN ABDULAZIZ [SA], et al) [X] 1,2,6-10,14,17,18,22-24 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039]; claim 6 *; | [X]US2013126169 (AL-NAKHLI AYMAN RAJA [SA], et al) [X] 9-11,14-16 * claims 1,8,9,11 *; | [X]US2013180720 (AL-DAHLAN MOHAMMED NASSER [SA], et al) [X] 9-16 * paragraphs [0051] , [0052] , [0046] , [0023]; claim 12 * |