EP3122742 - QUINOXALINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS FGFR KINASE MODULATORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2022 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: AL | published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astex Therapeutics Ltd 436 Cambridge Science Park Milton Road Cambridge Cambridgeshire CB4 0QA / GB | [2017/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERMEULEN, Wim Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
HOSTYN, Steven Anna Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | 03 /
CUYCKENS, Filip Albert Celine Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | 04 /
JONES, Russell Mark Bruderholzstrasse 38 4102 Binningen / CH | 05 /
BROGGINI, Diego Fernando Domenico Cilag AG Hochstrasse 201 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | [2018/38] |
Former [2017/05] | 01 /
VERMEULEN, Wim Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | ||
02 /
HOSTYN, Steven Anna Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | |||
03 /
CUYCKENS, Filip Albert Celine Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | |||
04 /
JONES, Russell Mark Bruderholzstrasse 38 CH-4102 Binningen / CH | |||
05 /
BROGGINI, Diego Fernando Domenico Cilag AG Hochstrasse 201 CH-8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Representative(s) | Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2018/38] |
Former [2017/05] | Trueman, Lucy Petra Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15720269.8 | 26.03.2015 | [2017/05] | WO2015EP56507 | Priority number, date | EP20140161820 | 26.03.2014 Original published format: EP 14161820 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015144803 | Date: | 01.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3122742 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3122742 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D403/14, A61K31/4985, A61P35/00 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
C07D403/14 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,EA,US);
A61K31/498 (KR);
A61K31/5513 (EP,EA,KR,US);
A61P35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/05] | Extension states | BA | 25.10.2016 | ME | 25.10.2016 | Validation states | MA | 25.10.2016 | Title | German: | CHINOXALINDERIVATE ALS FGFR KINASE MODULATOREN | [2017/40] | English: | QUINOXALINE DERIVATIVES USEFUL AS FGFR KINASE MODULATORS | [2017/05] | French: | DÉRIVÉS DE QUINOXALINE UTILES EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DE LA FGFR KINASE | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/05] | CHINOXALINDERIVATE ALS FGFR-KINASEMODULATOREN | ||
Former [2017/05] | DÉRIVÉS DE QUINOXALINE UTILES EN TANT QUE MODULATEURS DE LA KINASE FGFR | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/05] | 25.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 02.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 03.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2022/35] |
Former [2022/31] | AL | 19.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2011135376 (ASTEX THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-29* claims 1-25 *; | [AD]WO2012073017 (ASTEX THERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-29 * claims 1-21 * | by applicant | US4166117 | US4666828 | US4683202 | US4801531 | US5192659 | EP0548934 | US5272057 | US5882864 | WO0042026 | WO0055153 | US6218529 | WO0168047 | WO02096873 | WO03076416 | WO2004030635 | WO2004098494 | WO2005007099 | WO2006092430 | WO2007003419 | WO2008003702 | WO2008141065 | WO2009141386 | WO2011026579 | WO2011028947 | WO2011047129 | WO2011135376 | WO2012073017 | WO2012154760 | WO2013061074 | WO2013061081 | WO2013061077 | WO2013061080 | WO2013179034 | WO2013179033 | WO2014174307 | - BERGE ET AL., "Pharmaceutically Acceptable Salts", J. PHARM. SCI., (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - Pharmaceutical Salts: Properties, Selection, and Use, (200208), page 388 | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, WILEY INTERSCIENCE | - L. W. DEADY, SYN. COMM., (1977), vol. 7, pages 509 - 514 | - JERRY MARCH, Advanced Organic Chemistry, JOHN WILEY & SONS, (1992), pages 109 - 114 | - CAHN; INGOLD; PRELOG, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1966), vol. 5, pages 385 - 415 | - KNIGHTS ET AL., PHARMACOLOGY AND THERAPEUTICS, (2010), vol. 125, no. 1, pages 105 - 117 | - KORC M. ET AL., CURRENT CANCER DRUG TARGETS, (2009), vol. 9, no. 5, pages 639 - 651 | - ANGERER, Meth. Enzymol., (1987), vol. 152, page 649 | - "Fluorescence In Situ Hybridization: Technical Overview", JOHN M. S. BARTLETT, Molecular Diagnosis of Cancer, Methods and Protocols, 2nd ed.;, (200403), pages 077 - 088, ISBN 1-59259-760-2 | - DEPRIMO ET AL., BMC CANCER, (2003), vol. 3, page 3 | - ORRE; ROGERS, INT J CANCER, (1999), vol. 84, no. 2, pages 101 - 8 |