EP3134413 - SUBSTITUTED [1,2,4]TRIAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-7-YL COMPOUNDS AS PDE2 INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/09] | SUBSTITUTED [1,2,4]TRIAZOLO [1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-7-YL COMPOUNDS AS PDE2 INHIBITORS | ||
[2018/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dart NeuroScience (Cayman) Ltd. 10 Market Street No.774 Camana Bay Grand Cayman KY1-9006 / KY | [2017/15] |
Former [2017/09] | For all designated states Dart Neuroscience (Cayman) Ltd 10 Market Street No.774 Camana Bay Grand Cayman, KY 1-9006 / KY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREITENBUCHER, James 12278 Scripps Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 02 /
FREESTONE, Graeme 12278 Scripps Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 03 /
GOMEZ, Laurent 12278 Scripps Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 04 /
LEMUS, Robert 12278 Scripps Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 05 /
LY, Kiev 12278 Scripps Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 06 /
MCCARRICK, Margaret 12278 Scripps Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 07 /
VERNIER, William 12278 Scripps Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 08 /
VICKERS, Troy 12278 Scripps Summit Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 15721086.5 | 22.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015US27102 | Priority number, date | US201461983387P | 23.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461983387 P | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015164508 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134413 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3134413 | Date: | 11.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07D519/00, A61K31/505, A61P25/14 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,CN,IL,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,KR,RU,US);
A61K31/4196 (KR);
A61P25/18 (US);
A61P25/22 (US);
A61P25/24 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | 18.11.2016 | ME | 18.11.2016 | Validation states | MA | 18.11.2016 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUIERTE [1,2,4]TRIAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-7-YL VERBINDUNGEN ALS PDE2-INHIBITOREN | [2018/28] | English: | SUBSTITUTED [1,2,4]TRIAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-7-YL COMPOUNDS AS PDE2 INHIBITORS | [2018/28] | French: | COMPOSÉS DE [1,2,4]TRIAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-7-YLE SUBSTITUÉS UTILISABLES EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE PDE2 | [2017/09] |
Former [2017/09] | SUBSTITUIERTE [ 1,2,4 ] TRIAZOLO [ 1,5-A ] PYRIMIDIN-7-YL VERBINDUNGEN ALS PDE2-INHIBITOREN | ||
Former [2017/09] | SUBSTITUTED [1,2,4]TRIAZOLO [1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-7-YL COMPOUNDS AS PDE2 INHIBITORS | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 18.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.11.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19194930.4 / EP3597649 | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.04.2015 | AL | 11.09.2019 | CY | 11.09.2019 | CZ | 11.09.2019 | EE | 11.09.2019 | FI | 11.09.2019 | HR | 11.09.2019 | LT | 11.09.2019 | LV | 11.09.2019 | MC | 11.09.2019 | MK | 11.09.2019 | MT | 11.09.2019 | NL | 11.09.2019 | PL | 11.09.2019 | RO | 11.09.2019 | RS | 11.09.2019 | SE | 11.09.2019 | SI | 11.09.2019 | SK | 11.09.2019 | SM | 11.09.2019 | TR | 11.09.2019 | BG | 11.12.2019 | NO | 11.12.2019 | GR | 12.12.2019 | IS | 12.01.2020 | PT | 13.01.2020 | LU | 22.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.04.2015 | |
AL | 11.09.2019 | ||
CY | 11.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
MT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
TR | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
MC | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SI | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
IS | 12.01.2020 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
SM | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
CZ | 11.09.2019 | ||
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
SK | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
PL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RO | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
EE | 11.09.2019 | ||
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
PT | 13.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/20] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
NL | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 11.09.2019 | |
FI | 11.09.2019 | ||
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
HR | 11.09.2019 | ||
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
LV | 11.09.2019 | ||
RS | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
GR | 12.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
SE | 11.09.2019 | ||
BG | 11.12.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 11.09.2019 | |
LT | 11.09.2019 | ||
NO | 11.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 11.09.2019 | |
NO | 11.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4447438 (LEDELEC LUCIEN [FR], et al); | [A]US2012214791 (HELAL CHRISTOPHER JOHN [US], et al); | [AD]US8598155 (HELAL CHRISTOPHER JOHN [US], et al) | by applicant | US4938949 | US6573263 | EP1363912 | WO2004044234 | WO2004108136 | WO2005041957 | US2008188525 | US7410963 | US2009053140 | US7671050 | WO2010054260 | WO2010054253 | US7851472 | US7868015 | WO2011011312 | US7947731 | US8106047 | WO2012104293 | WO2012168817 | WO2013000924 | WO2013034755 | WO2013034758 | WO2013034761 | US8598155 |