EP3071757 - ENSEMBLE OF MOUNTING FRAME AND SANITARY APPLIANCE MOUNTED ON THE MOUNTING FRAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2016/39] | MOUNTING DEVICE | ||
[2017/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2021 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.05.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.01.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2016/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LECHNER, Peter Rütistrasse 70 8645 Jona / CH | [2016/39] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2020/27] |
Former [2016/39] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph Isler & Pedrazzini AG Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 15721735.7 | 13.05.2015 | [2016/39] | WO2015EP60608 | Priority number, date | EP20140169828 | 26.05.2014 Original published format: EP 14169828 | EP20140169831 | 26.05.2014 Original published format: EP 14169831 | [2016/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015180963 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3071757 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3071757 | Date: | 01.07.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/32, E03D11/14 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
E03D11/143 (EP);
E03C1/32 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/39] | E03D11/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG MIT EINER MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG UND EIN AN DER MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG MONTIERTER SANITÄRARTIKEL | [2020/04] | English: | ENSEMBLE OF MOUNTING FRAME AND SANITARY APPLIANCE MOUNTED ON THE MOUNTING FRAME | [2020/04] | French: | ARRANGEMENT AVEC UN CADRE DE MONTAGE ET UN APPRAIL SANITAIRE MONTÉ SUR LE CADRE DE MONTAGE | [2020/04] |
Former [2016/39] | MONTAGEVORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2016/39] | MOUNTING DEVICE | ||
Former [2016/39] | DISPOSITIF DE MONTAGE | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2016 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/39] | 16.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.05.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.05.2015 | AL | 01.07.2020 | CY | 01.07.2020 | CZ | 01.07.2020 | EE | 01.07.2020 | ES | 01.07.2020 | FI | 01.07.2020 | HR | 01.07.2020 | LT | 01.07.2020 | LV | 01.07.2020 | MC | 01.07.2020 | MK | 01.07.2020 | RO | 01.07.2020 | RS | 01.07.2020 | SI | 01.07.2020 | SK | 01.07.2020 | SM | 01.07.2020 | TR | 01.07.2020 | BG | 01.10.2020 | GR | 02.10.2020 | IS | 01.11.2020 | PT | 02.11.2020 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 13.05.2015 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
MK | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 13.05.2015 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
CY | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2023/28] | HU | 13.05.2015 | |
AL | 01.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
MC | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SI | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SK | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 01.07.2020 | |
CZ | 01.07.2020 | ||
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
EE | 01.07.2020 | ||
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RO | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
SM | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
HR | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
LV | 01.07.2020 | ||
RS | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
IS | 01.11.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | CZ | 01.07.2020 | |
ES | 01.07.2020 | ||
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
GR | 02.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | ES | 01.07.2020 | |
FI | 01.07.2020 | ||
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
PT | 02.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 01.07.2020 | |
LT | 01.07.2020 | ||
BG | 01.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | BG | 01.10.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3273173 (MORRIS EARL L, et al) [X] 1-5,19-21,24 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0343071 (PLACOPLATRE SA [FR]) [X] 1-7,19-21,23,24 * figures 1,2,8C,9,13 *; | [X]EP0731226 (ROST & CO GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5,19-24 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [XA]WO2013041745 (FOMINAYA SA [ES], et al) [X] 1-7,19-24 * figures 1,2 *[A] 8 | Examination | DE20214274U |