EP3134112 - METHODS OF IMPROVING OR ACCELERATING PHYSICAL RECOVERY AFTER SURGERY FOR HIP FRACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANKO, Laszlo c/o Novartis Pharma AG Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH | 02 /
PAPANICOLAOU, Dimitris c/o Novartis Pharmaceuticals Corporation One Health Plaza East Hanover, New Jersey 07936-1080 / US | 03 /
GOLDHAHN, Jörg c/o Novartis Pharma AG Postfach CH-4002 Basel / CH | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Didelon, Frédéric Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 15722260.5 | 24.04.2015 | [2017/09] | WO2015IB52990 | Priority number, date | US201461983565P | 24.04.2014 Original published format: US 201461983565 P | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015162590 | Date: | 29.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3134112 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, C07K16/18, C07K16/28 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K39/3955 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (CN);
C07K2317/21 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K2317/55 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | 24.11.2016 | ME | 24.11.2016 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG ODER BESCHLEUNIGUNG DER KÖRPERLICHEN ERHOLUNG NACH EINER HÜFTBRUCHOPERATION | [2017/09] | English: | METHODS OF IMPROVING OR ACCELERATING PHYSICAL RECOVERY AFTER SURGERY FOR HIP FRACTURE | [2017/09] | French: | MÉTHODES D'AMÉLIORATION OU D'ACCÉLÉRATION DE LA RÉCUPÉRATION PHYSIQUE APRÈS UNE INTERVENTION CHIRURGICALE POUR UNE FRACTURE DU COL DU FÉMUR | [2017/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 24.10.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.11.2018 | 07.11.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/15] | 29.11.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP18201533.9 / EP3461495 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006083182 (OVITA LTD [NZ], et al); | [XDI]WO2010125003 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al); | [XI]WO2011151432 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al); | by applicant | US4399216 | EP0154316 | US4634665 | WO8704462 | WO8901036 | US4816567 | EP0322094 | EP0338841 | US4881175 | US4946778 | EP0401384 | US5013653 | US5091513 | WO9203918 | EP0486525 | US5132405 | US5179017 | WO9312227 | US5223409 | US5225539 | US5258498 | US5260203 | WO9404678 | WO9425585 | WO9429351 | US5403484 | US5427908 | US5455030 | US5476996 | US5476786 | US5482858 | US5530101 | US5545806 | US5545807 | US5569825 | US5571698 | US5580717 | US5585089 | WO9713852 | US5624821 | US5625126 | US5633425 | US5648260 | US5661016 | US5677425 | US5693762 | US5698767 | US5714350 | WO9818943 | US5759808 | WO9824884 | US5770429 | US5789650 | US5814318 | US5831012 | US5869046 | US5874299 | US5877397 | US5885793 | WO9916873 | US5939598 | WO9945962 | US5969108 | WO9954342 | US6075181 | WO0042072 | US6114598 | US6121022 | US6150584 | US6162963 | US6165745 | US6172197 | WO0104144 | US6180370 | US6194551 | WO0114424 | US6277375 | EP1176195 | US6350861 | WO0243478 | WO02092780 | US6521404 | US6544731 | US6555313 | WO03035835 | US6582915 | US6593081 | US2003153043 | WO03074679 | WO2004039841 | US2004161738 | US2004175756 | US6818418 | WO2004106368 | US2005048512 | US2005053973 | US6946292 | EP1297172 | US2005255552 | US2006008844 | WO2007146689 | WO2010125003 |