EP3195365 - DOUBLE HETEROJUNCTION III-NITRIDE STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.08.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.06.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | [2021/02] |
Former [2017/30] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 0245-1449 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REZA, Shahed 668 Depot Road Boxborough, Massachusetts 01719 / US | 02 /
CHUMBES, Eduardo, M. 11 Crescent Drive 11 Andover, Massachusetts 01810-1532 / US | 03 /
KAZIOR, Thomas, E. 34 Blacksmith Drive Sudbury, Massachusetts 01776 / US | 04 /
SOLLNER, Gerhard 24 Mason Street Winchester, Massachusetts 01890 / US | [2017/30] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/30] | Application number, filing date | 15722414.8 | 07.05.2015 | [2017/30] | WO2015US29628 | Priority number, date | US201414457436 | 12.08.2014 Original published format: US201414457436 | [2017/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016025043 | Date: | 18.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3195365 | Date: | 26.07.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3195365 | Date: | 13.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/778, H01L29/20 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
H01L29/7784 (EP,US);
H01L29/36 (US);
H01L21/2654 (US);
H01L29/205 (US);
H01L29/66462 (US);
H01L29/7786 (US);
H01L29/7787 (US);
H01L29/7788 (US);
H01L29/7789 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | III-NITRID-STRUKTUREN MIT DOPPELTEM HETEROÜBERGANG | [2017/30] | English: | DOUBLE HETEROJUNCTION III-NITRIDE STRUCTURES | [2017/30] | French: | STRUCTURES À BASE DE NITRURE III À DOUBLE HÉTÉROJONCTION | [2017/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/30] | 22.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.05.2015 | AL | 13.01.2021 | AT | 13.01.2021 | CY | 13.01.2021 | CZ | 13.01.2021 | DK | 13.01.2021 | EE | 13.01.2021 | ES | 13.01.2021 | FI | 13.01.2021 | HR | 13.01.2021 | LT | 13.01.2021 | LV | 13.01.2021 | MC | 13.01.2021 | MK | 13.01.2021 | MT | 13.01.2021 | NL | 13.01.2021 | PL | 13.01.2021 | RO | 13.01.2021 | RS | 13.01.2021 | SI | 13.01.2021 | SK | 13.01.2021 | SM | 13.01.2021 | TR | 13.01.2021 | BG | 13.04.2021 | NO | 13.04.2021 | GR | 14.04.2021 | IE | 07.05.2021 | LU | 07.05.2021 | IS | 13.05.2021 | PT | 13.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 07.05.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
MK | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
TR | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 07.05.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
MK | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 07.05.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CY | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 07.05.2015 | |
AL | 13.01.2021 | ||
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IE | 07.05.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SI | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
ES | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
LU | 07.05.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 13.01.2021 | |
AT | 13.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
MC | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RO | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SK | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
DK | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
CZ | 13.01.2021 | ||
EE | 13.01.2021 | ||
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
SM | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
IS | 13.05.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
PL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 13.01.2021 | |
FI | 13.01.2021 | ||
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
LV | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
RS | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
BG | 13.04.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
GR | 14.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
HR | 13.01.2021 | ||
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NL | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 13.01.2021 | |
LT | 13.01.2021 | ||
NO | 13.04.2021 | ||
PT | 13.05.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004238842 (MICOVIC MIROSLAV [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,7-13,18 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006226442 (ZHANG AN-PING [US], et al) [X] 1,9,12,13,18 * paragraphs [0028] , [0 31]; figure 6 *; | [A] - LEE H-C ET AL, "Enhanced electrical characteristics of AlGaN/GaN heterostructure field-effect transistor with p-GaN back barriers and Si delta-doped layer", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, JP, (20080401), vol. 47, no. 4, doi:10.1143/JJAP.47.2824, ISSN 0021-4922, pages 2824 - 2827, XP001518629 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1143/JJAP.47.2824 | [AD] - N BUFFER; T. PALACIOS; A. CHAKRABORTY; S. HEIKMAN; S. KELLER; S.P. DENBAARS; U.K. MISHRA, IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (2006), vol. 27, pages 13 - 15, XP002741887 [AD] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LED.2005.860882 | by applicant | - N BUFFER; T. PALACIOS; A. CHAKRABORTY; S. HEIKMAN; S. KELLER; S.P. DENBAARS; U.K. MISHRA, IEEE ELECTRON DEVICE LETTERS, (2006), vol. 27, pages 13 - 15 |