EP3139751 - DESIGN FOOD FORMING DRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEA Food Solutions Bakel B.V. Beekakker 11 5761 EN Bakel / NL | [2017/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN GERWEN, Hendrikus Petrus Gerardus Ter Hofstadlaan 39 NL-5711 VT Someren / NL | 02 /
SCHOENMAKERS, Petrus Hubertus Maria Picardie 82 NL-6591 JG Gennep / NL | 03 /
DE BIJL, Andreas Leonardus Volley 2 NL-5275 LA Den Dungen / NL | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 15722504.6 | 05.05.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015EP59877 | Priority number, date | EP20140167687 | 09.05.2014 Original published format: EP 14167687 | EP20140172120 | 12.06.2014 Original published format: EP 14172120 | EP20140199457 | 19.12.2014 Original published format: EP 14199457 | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015169812 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139751 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A22C7/00 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
A22C7/0069 (EP,CN,US);
A21C3/028 (US);
A22C7/003 (RU);
A23P30/10 (EP,US);
A23P10/28 (EP);
Y10T29/49549 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Title | German: | DESIGNLEBENSMITTELFORMUNGSTROMMEL | [2017/11] | English: | DESIGN FOOD FORMING DRUM | [2017/11] | French: | CONCEPTION D'UN TAMBOUR DE FAÇONNAGE D'ALIMENTS | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 12.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/52] | 02.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2017/52] | Divisional application(s) | EP17177897.0 / EP3243389 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP2253219 (MAREL TOWNSEND FURTHER PROC B [NL]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0038]; figures 4a, 4b * [I] 2; | [A]WO2012107236 (GEA CFS BAKEL B V [NL], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 25 - page 26; figure 45 * |