EP3234820 - LATTICE STRUCTURE REPRESENTATION FOR A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2022 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2022 [2022/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2019/20] |
Former [2017/43] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 11445 Compaq Center Drive West Houston, Texas 77070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA-REYERO VINAS, Juan Manuel Cami de Can Graells 1-21 E-08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 02 /
MOROVIC, Jan 42 Scythe Way Colchester CO3 4SJ / GB | 03 /
MOROVIC, Peter Cami de Can Graells 1-21 E-08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | 04 /
DE PENA, Alejandro Manuel Cami de Can Graells 1-21 E-08174 Sant Cugat del Valles / ES | [2017/43] | Representative(s) | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15722663.0 | 23.04.2015 | [2017/43] | WO2015EP58862 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016169606 | Date: | 27.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3234820 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, B29C67/00 | [2017/43] | CPC: |
B33Y50/00 (EP,CN,US);
G06F30/00 (EP,CN,US);
B29C64/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/43] | Title | German: | GITTERSTRUKTURDARSTELLUNG FÜR EIN DREIDIMENSIONALES OBJEKT | [2017/43] | English: | LATTICE STRUCTURE REPRESENTATION FOR A THREE-DIMENSIONAL OBJECT | [2017/43] | French: | REPRÉSENTATION DE STRUCTURE EN TREILLIS POUR UN OBJET TRIDIMENSIONNEL | [2017/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2017 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/43] | 21.07.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.02.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/09] | 26.10.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2014172687 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** figures 8-9 *; | [I] - CHO W ET AL, "A dithering algorithm for local composition control with three-dimensional printing", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20030801), vol. 35, no. 9, doi:10.1016/S0010-4485(02)00122-7, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 851 - 867, XP004422055 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 851, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 853, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 2; figures 4-6 * * page 860, column 2, paragraph 2 - page 862, column 2, paragraph 1; figures 13-15 * * page 865, column 2, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0010-4485(02)00122-7 |