EP3149290 - VARIABLE VALVE TIMING CAMSHAFT WITH IMPROVED OIL TRANSFER BETWEEN INNER AND OUTER SHAFTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.09.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta TecCenter AG Wirtschaftspark 37 9492 Eschen / LI | [2018/16] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Thyssenkrupp Presta Teccenter Ag Wirtschaftspark 37 9492 Eschen / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEIDAUER, Marcel Hans-Sachs-Strasse 38 09126 Chemnitz / DE | 02 /
MANN, Bernd Lessingstrasse 11 09405 Zschopau / DE | 03 /
DIETEL, Uwe Am Lindenbrunnen 10 08115 Lichtentanne / DE | 04 /
MEUSEL, Jürgen Hauptstrasse 19 09573 Dittmannsdorf / DE | 05 /
KUNZ, Michael Wilhelm-Külz-Strasse 7 04452 Borna / DE | 06 /
LEHMANN, Martin Dorfstrasse 11 01855 Mittelndorf / DE | [2019/16] |
Former [2017/14] | 01 /
WEIDAUER, Marcel Hans-Sachs-Strasse 38 09126 Chemnitz / DE | ||
02 /
MANN, Bernd Lessingstrasse 11 09405 Zschopau / DE | |||
03 /
DIETEL, Uwe Am Lindenbrunnen 10 08115 Lichtentanne / DE | |||
04 /
MEUSEL, Jürgen Hauptstrasse 19 09573 Dittmannsdorf / DE | |||
05 /
KUNZ, Michael Flemmingstrasse 31 09116 Chemnitz / DE | |||
06 /
LEHMANN, Martin Dorfstrasse 11 01855 Mittelndorf / DE | Representative(s) | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | [2018/46] |
Former [2017/14] | ThyssenKrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15722683.8 | 30.04.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015EP59581 | Priority number, date | DE201410107475 | 27.05.2014 Original published format: DE102014107475 | [2017/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2015180925 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3149290 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3149290 | Date: | 14.11.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F01L1/047, F01L1/344 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
F01L1/047 (EP,CN,US);
F01L1/3442 (US);
F01L2001/0471 (EP,CN,US);
F01L2001/0473 (EP,CN,US);
F01L2001/0475 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/14] | F01L1/047 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARE NOCKENWELLE MIT VERBESSERTER ÖLÜBERGABE ZWISCHEN INNENWELLE UND AUSSENWELLE | [2017/14] | English: | VARIABLE VALVE TIMING CAMSHAFT WITH IMPROVED OIL TRANSFER BETWEEN INNER AND OUTER SHAFTS | [2017/14] | French: | ARBRE À CAMES VARIABLE À TRANSFERT D'HUILE AMÉLIORÉ ENTRE L'ARBRE INTÉRIEUR ET L'ARBRE EXTÉRIEUR | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 07.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.10.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 14.11.2018 | CY | 14.11.2018 | CZ | 14.11.2018 | DK | 14.11.2018 | EE | 14.11.2018 | ES | 14.11.2018 | FI | 14.11.2018 | HR | 14.11.2018 | LT | 14.11.2018 | LV | 14.11.2018 | MC | 14.11.2018 | MK | 14.11.2018 | MT | 14.11.2018 | NL | 14.11.2018 | PL | 14.11.2018 | RO | 14.11.2018 | RS | 14.11.2018 | SI | 14.11.2018 | SK | 14.11.2018 | SM | 14.11.2018 | TR | 14.11.2018 | BG | 14.02.2019 | NO | 14.02.2019 | GR | 15.02.2019 | IS | 14.03.2019 | PT | 14.03.2019 | BE | 30.04.2019 | CH | 30.04.2019 | IE | 30.04.2019 | LI | 30.04.2019 | LU | 30.04.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
MT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CY | 14.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
IE | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
TR | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
BE | 30.04.2019 | ||
CH | 30.04.2019 | ||
LI | 30.04.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
LU | 30.04.2019 | ||
Former [2020/02] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
MC | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SI | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SK | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
EE | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RO | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
SM | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
CZ | 14.11.2018 | ||
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
PL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
DK | 14.11.2018 | ||
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 14.11.2018 | |
ES | 14.11.2018 | ||
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
PT | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | ES | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
RS | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | ES | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
GR | 15.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | ES | 14.11.2018 | |
FI | 14.11.2018 | ||
HR | 14.11.2018 | ||
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
LV | 14.11.2018 | ||
NL | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
BG | 14.02.2019 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 14.11.2018 | |
LT | 14.11.2018 | ||
NO | 14.02.2019 | ||
IS | 14.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 14.11.2018 | |
NO | 14.02.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4974561 (MURASAKI AKIRA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH10122228 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-6,8* abstract *; | [Y]US5823152 (USHIDA MASAYASU [JP]) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102006028611 (MAHLE INT GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [XA]EP2415979 (HYDRAULIK RING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6,8 * paragraph [0037]; figure 3 * [A] 7,9,10; | [Y]CN202215574U (DONGFENG CUMMINS ENGINE CO LTD) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102011077532 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract *; | [Y]DE102011082591 (SCHAEFFLER TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [Y] 1-6,8 * abstract * |