EP3143818 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, NETWORK NODE, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, METHODS AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDOFF, Bengt Öresundsvägen 5 S-237 35 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
SORRENTINO, Stefano Hannebergsgatan 32 S-171 68 Solna / SE | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2017/12] | Application number, filing date | 15724194.4 | 11.05.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015EP60358 | Priority number, date | US201461994269P | 16.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461994269 P | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015173187 | Date: | 19.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143818 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,CN,US);
H04W28/0215 (US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W76/14 (EP,US);
H04W8/005 (US);
H04L5/001 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, NETZWERKKNOTEN, KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND COMPUTERPROGRAMME | [2017/12] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, NETWORK NODE, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, METHODS AND COMPUTER PROGRAMS | [2017/12] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION, NOEUD DE RÉSEAU, DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉS ET PROGRAMMES D'ORDINATEUR | [2017/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 28.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 23.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2012077510 (CHEN TAO [FI], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 2, paragraphs 25,28,30 * * page 3, paragraphs 34,35 *; | [X]WO2013068788 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * page 2, lines 1-15 * * page 7, lines 30-37 * * page 18, line 20 - page 19, line 37 * * page 20, line 23 - page 21, line 3 * * page 21, lines 12-24 * * page 22, lines 10-12, 19-23, 34-35 * * page 23, lines 15-19,31-37 * * page 24, lines 1-4 * * page 25, lines 11-15 * * page 26, lines 11-24 * * page 27, lines 12-14,27-37 * * page 31, lines 6-9 *; | [A]US2013188552 (KAZMI MUHAMMAD [SE], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 65 * * page 7, paragraph 80 * * page 8, paragraph 81 ** page 11, paragraph 111 - page 12, paragraph 117 * |