EP3304976 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD THEREIN FOR HANDOVER IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.03.2021 [2021/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2018/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDOFF, Bengt Öresundsvägen 5 S-237 35 Bjärred / SE | 02 /
ÅSTRÖM, Magnus Nordanväg 20 S-222 28 Lund / SE | 03 /
EKER, Johan Äpplehagen 6 S-223 55 Lund / SE | 04 /
NILSSON, Johan Trulsibrunnsvägen 20A S-236 38 Höllviken / SE | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2018/15] | Application number, filing date | 15725651.2 | 02.06.2015 | [2018/15] | WO2015EP62237 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016192775 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3304976 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/30, H04W36/36 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H04W36/08 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/0085 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/00837 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/304 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DARIN ZUR ÜBERGABE IN DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2018/15] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE AND METHOD THEREIN FOR HANDOVER IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATION NETWORK | [2018/15] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ, POUR UN TRANSFERT DANS UN RÉSEAU DE COMMUNICATIONS SANS FIL | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 23.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 17.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/11] | 06.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 14.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2011019580 (NAGASAWA CHIZUKO [JP], et al); | [XI]US2011319071 (BEPPLER DAVID [US], et al); | [A]KR20130056677 (KT CORP [KR]); | [A]EP2663129 (UROS OY [FI]); | [A]JP2015062265 (NTT DOCOMO INC) |