EP3140790 - ISSUE TRACKING AND RESOLUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2021 [2021/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEET, Inc. 45207 Helm Street Plymouth MI 48170 / US | [2020/35] |
Former [2020/12] | For all designated states BEET, Inc. 45207 Helm Street Plymouth, MI 48178 / US | ||
Former [2017/11] | For all designated states Beet, LLC 45207 Helm Street Plymouth, MI 48170 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, David Jingqiu 44791 Oak Forest Drive Northville, Michigan 48168 / US | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | McDonough, Jonathan Stonehampton IP Law Limited 7 Wragley House Valley Road Hebden Bridge West Yorkshire HX7 7BN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/11] | McDonough, Jonathan Hepworth Browne 7 Wragley House Valley Road Hebden Bridge West Yorkshire HX7 7BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 15725934.2 | 08.05.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015US30039 | Priority number, date | US201461990151P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990151 P | US201461990156P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990156 P | US201461990158P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990158 P | US201461990159P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990159 P | US201461990163P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990163 P | US201461990169P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990169 P | US201461990170P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990170 P | US201461990172P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990172 P | US201461990148P | 08.05.2014 Original published format: US 201461990148 P | US201462060501P | 06.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462060501 P | US201514705421 | 06.05.2015 Original published format: US201514705421 | [2017/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015172117 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3140790 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G05B23/02 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
G06Q30/016 (EP,US);
G05B23/0278 (EP,CN,US);
G06Q10/063114 (EP,US);
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q10/103 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31365 (EP,CN,US);
Y02P90/02 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Title | German: | PROBLEMVERFOLGUNGS- UND BEHEBUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/11] | English: | ISSUE TRACKING AND RESOLUTION SYSTEM | [2017/11] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SUIVI ET DE RÉSOLUTION DE PROBLÈMES | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 13.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/17] | 22.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US6222535 (HURD II DONALD M [US]) [I] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [XI]US6459949 (BLACK HANG T [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-16 * column 1, line 6 - line 10 * * column 2, line 24 - column 4, line 61 * * figures 2-8 * [I] 10; | [XI]US2005039192 (CHAVEZ JOSE R [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-16 * the whole document * [I] 10; | [I]US2005050210 (KENNEDY DOUGLAS MARK [US]) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0033] - [0039] - [0052] - [0056] - [0060] , [0061] , [0068] , [0076] , [0080] - [0093] - [0103] , [0108] , [0112] , [0113] * * figures 2,5-8,12 *; | [I]US2005086248 (ATCHISON CHARLES [US]) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0005] , [0037] , [0040] - [0047] - [0053] - [0060] - [0067] ** figures 1,5 *; | [I]US7392100 (THOMAS DAVID ELLIS [US], et al) [I] 1-16 * column 1, line 8 - line 11 * * column 2, line 45 - line 58 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 10 * * column 10, line 1 - column 13, line 60 *; | [XI]US2009119147 (MESSER MARTIN [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraphs [0015] - [0037] * * figures 1-4,7 * [I] 2-5,7-16; | [I]US2010082388 (DIXIT MILIND VINOD [IN], et al) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0009] , [0020] - [0028] - [0040] - [0042] - [0049] - [0062] *; | [XI]US8028197 (BARUA ABHIK [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-16 * column 1, line 19 - column 5, line 30 * * column 8, line 39 - column 9, line 62 * * figure 1 * [I] 10 |