EP3119973 - WINDOW FITTING THAT HINDERS BREAK-INS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spasovski, Marjan Postfach 18 02 89 60083 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Fuchs Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Tower 185 Friedrich-Ebert-Anlage 35-37 60327 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/04] | Meyer-Dulheuer, Karl-Hermann Dr. Meyer- Dulheuer & Partners LLP Franklinstrasse 46-48 60486 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 15726505.9 | 12.03.2015 | [2017/04] | WO2015DE00114 | Priority number, date | DE20141003942 | 20.03.2014 Original published format: DE102014003942 | [2017/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015139677 | Date: | 24.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3119973 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.09.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | E06B5/11 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
E06B5/113 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/04] | Title | German: | EINBRUCHHEMENDE FENSTERBESCHLAG | [2017/04] | English: | WINDOW FITTING THAT HINDERS BREAK-INS | [2017/04] | French: | FERRURE DE FENÊTRE ANTIEFFRACTION | [2017/04] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2016 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2016 | Examination requested [2017/04] | 19.10.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4725084 (CATRICOLA FRANK [US]) [X] 1 * column 4; figures 4-6, 6A *[I] 2 |