EP3305006 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND DEVICES FOR CONNECTING A USER EQUIPMENT, UE, TO A TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [2019/28] |
Former [2018/15] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANBERG, Olof Axel Turevägen 6A 191 47 Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
ANDREI, Diana Drabantgatan 49:22 582 14 Linköping / SE | 03 /
AXELSSON, Samuel Kvinnebyvägen 230 589 33 Linköping / SE | 04 /
GUNNARSSON, Fredrik Tinnerbäcksgrand 28 587 50 Linköping / SE | [2018/15] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2019/28] |
Former [2018/15] | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 15726588.5 | 29.05.2015 | [2018/15] | WO2015EP61996 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016192757 | Date: | 08.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3305006 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2018/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3305006 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/20, H04W76/19, H04W92/12 | [2019/15] | CPC: |
H04W76/19 (EP,US);
H04W48/20 (EP,US);
H04W76/11 (US);
H04W76/15 (US);
H04W92/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2018/15] | H04W76/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR VERBINDUNG EINES BENUTZERGERÄTS (UE) AN EIN TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZWERK | [2018/15] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND DEVICES FOR CONNECTING A USER EQUIPMENT, UE, TO A TELECOMMUNICATION NETWORK. | [2018/15] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIFS DE CONNEXION D'UN ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR (UE) À UN RÉSEAU DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2018/15] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2017 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 27.11.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2015 | AL | 10.07.2019 | AT | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | ES | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | HR | 10.07.2019 | IT | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | MK | 10.07.2019 | MT | 10.07.2019 | NL | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | RS | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | SM | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | NO | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | IE | 29.05.2020 | LU | 29.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | FR | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.05.2015 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
MT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
FR | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 29.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
LU | 29.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 10.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005002261 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 14,16,19 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0024] * * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1928126 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-13,17,18 * paragraphs [0001] , [0009] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraphs [0056] , [0068] , [0094] * * figures 7, 10 *; | [Y]WO2013007313 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [Y] 1-13,17,18 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 7, line 36 - page 8, line 21 * * figure 5 *; | [I]WO2014187468 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 14-16,19 * page 15, line 1 - line 14 * * page 17, line 5 - page 20, line 25 * * page 22, line 24 - page 24, line 10 * * figures 2A, 3 *; | [A] - ERICSSON, "Combination of solutions for Retrievable Configurations", vol. RAN WG2, no. Fukuoka, Japan; 20150525 - 20150529, (20150515), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-152111, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_90/Docs/, (20150515), XP050970433 [A] 1,8,10,12,15-18 * the whole document * | [A] - ERICSSON, "Re-usable Configurations in RRC Signaling", vol. RAN WG2, no. San Francisco, US; 20141117 - 20141121, (20141107), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-144891 RE-USABLE CONFIGURATIONS IN RRC SIGNALING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_88/Docs/, (20141107), XP050886457 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * |