EP3204509 - BIOLUMINESCENT SUCCINATE DETECTION ASSAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promega Corporation 2800 Woods Hollow Road Madison, WI 53711-5399 / US | [2017/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALVES, Juliano 1004 North High Point Road Apt. 111 Madison, WI 53717 / US | 02 /
GOUELI, Said, A. 2654 Placid Street Fitchburg, WI 53711 / US | 03 /
ZEGZOUTI, Hicham 6602 Westin Drive Apt. 8 Madison, WI 53719 / US | [2017/33] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/28] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2017/33] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 15727175.0 | 18.05.2015 | [2017/33] | WO2015US31445 | Priority number, date | US201462061635P | 08.10.2014 Original published format: US 201462061635 P | [2017/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016057084 | Date: | 14.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3204509 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3204509 | Date: | 10.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/527, G01N33/573 | [2017/33] | CPC: |
C12Q1/25 (EP,US);
C12Q1/66 (US);
C12Q1/26 (EP,US);
C12Q1/48 (EP,US);
G01N2333/9015 (EP,US);
G01N2333/90245 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIOLUMINESZIERENDER TEST ZUM NACHWEIS VON SUCCINAT | [2017/33] | English: | BIOLUMINESCENT SUCCINATE DETECTION ASSAY | [2017/33] | French: | DOSAGE DE DÉTECTION DE SUCCINATE BIOLUMINESCENTE | [2017/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2017 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 04.05.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2015 | AL | 10.07.2019 | AT | 10.07.2019 | CY | 10.07.2019 | CZ | 10.07.2019 | DK | 10.07.2019 | EE | 10.07.2019 | ES | 10.07.2019 | FI | 10.07.2019 | HR | 10.07.2019 | IT | 10.07.2019 | LT | 10.07.2019 | LV | 10.07.2019 | MC | 10.07.2019 | MK | 10.07.2019 | MT | 10.07.2019 | NL | 10.07.2019 | PL | 10.07.2019 | RO | 10.07.2019 | RS | 10.07.2019 | SE | 10.07.2019 | SI | 10.07.2019 | SK | 10.07.2019 | SM | 10.07.2019 | TR | 10.07.2019 | BG | 10.10.2019 | NO | 10.10.2019 | GR | 11.10.2019 | IS | 10.11.2019 | PT | 11.11.2019 | IE | 18.05.2020 | LU | 18.05.2020 | BE | 31.05.2020 | CH | 31.05.2020 | LI | 31.05.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 18.05.2015 | |
AL | 10.07.2019 | ||
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CY | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
MT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
LU | 18.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
LU | 18.05.2020 | ||
BE | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IE | 18.05.2020 | ||
LU | 18.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
LU | 18.05.2020 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
MC | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2020 | ||
LI | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SI | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
SM | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
SK | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
IT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
PL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RO | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
DK | 10.07.2019 | ||
EE | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
TR | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 10.07.2019 | |
AT | 10.07.2019 | ||
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
IS | 10.11.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
ES | 10.07.2019 | ||
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
HR | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
LV | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
RS | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
GR | 11.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.07.2019 | |
FI | 10.07.2019 | ||
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
SE | 10.07.2019 | ||
BG | 10.10.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
PT | 11.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 10.07.2019 | |
LT | 10.07.2019 | ||
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 10.07.2019 | |
NL | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 10.07.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0794260 (KIKKOMAN CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-93 * claim - *; | [I]US6811990 (COREY MICHAEL J [US], et al) [I] 7-10* abstract *; | [Y]WO2009079120 (GENEWIZ INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-93 * abstract * * page 4 *; | [Y] - LUO LUSONG ET AL, "An assay for Fe(II)/2-oxoglutarate-dependent dioxygenases by enzyme-coupled detection of succinate formation.", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY 1 JUN 2006, (20060601), vol. 353, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 69 - 74, XP024942199 [Y] 1-93 * abstract * * Scheme 1 and 2; page 70, column l, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2006.03.033 | [I] - WIBOM R ET AL, "A sensitive method for measuring ATP-formation in rat muscle mitochondria.", SCANDINAVIAN JOURNAL OF CLINICAL AND LABORATORY INVESTIGATION APR 1990, (199004), vol. 50, no. 2, ISSN 0036-5513, pages 143 - 152, XP009185449 [I] 1-93 * abstract * * page 144, column r, paragraph 2 * |