EP3139951 - VACCINE FOR PREVENTION OF LYME BORRELIOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vyzkumny ústav veterinárního lékarství, v.v.i. Hudcova 296/70 621 00 Brno / CZ | For all designated states Univerzita Palackého v Olomouci Krízkovského 511/8 771 47 Olomouc / CZ | For all designated states Bioveta, A.S. Komenskeho 212/12 68323 Ivanovice na Hane / CZ | For all designated states Ustav organicke chemie a biochemie AV CR, v.v.i. Flemingovo nam. 542/2 166 10 Praha 6 / CZ | For all designated states Fyzikální ústav AV CR, v.v.i. Na Slovance 2 18221 Praha 8 / CZ | [2017/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURANEK, Jaroslav Brechtova 13 63800 Brno-Lesna / CZ | 02 /
MASEK, Josef Nejedleho 1 63800 Brno-Lesna / CZ | 03 /
RASKA, Milan Stupkova 7 77900 Olomouc / CZ | 04 /
WEIGL, Evzen Trnkova 13 77900 Olomouc / CZ | 05 /
KRUPKA, Michal Brnenska 42 77900 Olomouc / CZ | 06 /
BITTNER, Libor Sidliste Osvobozeni 651/35 68201 Vyskov-Dedice / CZ | 07 /
NEPERENY, Jiri Druzstevni 96/2 68201 Vyskov-Nosalovice / CZ | 08 /
VRZAL, Vladimir Malinovskeho 767/39 68323 Ivanovice na Hane / CZ | 09 /
LEDVINA, Miroslav Brezinova 513/2 18600 Praha 8 / CZ | 10 /
KRATOCHVILOVA, Irena K Haltyri 689/16 18100 Praha 8-Troja / CZ | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Hartvichova, Katerina, et al HARBER IP s.r.o. Dukelskych hrdinu 567/52 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [2020/37] |
Former [2017/11] | Hartvichova, Katerina Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | Application number, filing date | 15727869.8 | 11.05.2015 | [2017/11] | WO2015CZ00042 | Priority number, date | CZ20140000320 | 09.05.2014 Original published format: CZ 20140320 | [2017/11] | Filing language | CS | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015169271 | Date: | 12.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3139951 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.11.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3139951 | Date: | 09.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.11.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/02, C07K14/20, A61K39/00 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
C07K16/1207 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP);
A61K2039/70 (EP);
A61K39/0225 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
Y02A50/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPFSTOFF ZUR PRÄVENTION VON LYME-BORRELIOSE | [2017/11] | English: | VACCINE FOR PREVENTION OF LYME BORRELIOSIS | [2017/11] | French: | VACCIN POUR LA PRÉVENTION DE LA BORRÉLIOSE DE LYME | [2017/11] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 11.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 22.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 10.06.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/33] | Request for further processing for: | 22.09.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.09.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.10.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.05.2015 | AL | 09.09.2020 | AT | 09.09.2020 | CY | 09.09.2020 | DK | 09.09.2020 | EE | 09.09.2020 | ES | 09.09.2020 | FI | 09.09.2020 | HR | 09.09.2020 | IT | 09.09.2020 | LT | 09.09.2020 | LV | 09.09.2020 | MC | 09.09.2020 | MK | 09.09.2020 | MT | 09.09.2020 | NL | 09.09.2020 | PL | 09.09.2020 | RO | 09.09.2020 | RS | 09.09.2020 | SE | 09.09.2020 | SI | 09.09.2020 | SK | 09.09.2020 | SM | 09.09.2020 | TR | 09.09.2020 | BG | 09.12.2020 | NO | 09.12.2020 | GR | 10.12.2020 | IS | 09.01.2021 | PT | 11.01.2021 | IE | 11.05.2021 | LU | 11.05.2021 | BE | 31.05.2021 | CH | 31.05.2021 | LI | 31.05.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 11.05.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
TR | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 11.05.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
MK | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 11.05.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
CY | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 11.05.2015 | |
AL | 09.09.2020 | ||
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
BE | 31.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
IE | 11.05.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
CH | 31.05.2021 | ||
LI | 31.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
LU | 11.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
MC | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
IT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
DK | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SI | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SK | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 09.09.2020 | |
AT | 09.09.2020 | ||
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
ES | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
IS | 09.01.2021 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 09.09.2020 | |
EE | 09.09.2020 | ||
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
SM | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | EE | 09.09.2020 | |
FI | 09.09.2020 | ||
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RO | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
PT | 11.01.2021 | ||
Former [2021/18] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
NL | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
HR | 09.09.2020 | ||
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
LV | 09.09.2020 | ||
PL | 09.09.2020 | ||
RS | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
GR | 10.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
SE | 09.09.2020 | ||
BG | 09.12.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 09.09.2020 | |
LT | 09.09.2020 | ||
NO | 09.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9512676 (ASS UNIVERSITIES INC [US]) [X] 1,4-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract; pages 48-50; table III on page 52; claims 1-4, 6, 14, 43-48 *; | [I]WO2007065098 (UNIV VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH [US], et al) [I] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract; Examples 3-4; pages 65-66; Figures 13A-E, 15-17; claims 1-18, 28*; | [X]WO2011143617 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1,4-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract, Examples 3-5, 9-11, 12-17 and 19-22 *; | [I]WO2012054580 (UNIV VIRGINIA COMMONWEALTH [US], et al) [I] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract; Examples 1-4; claims 1-18 *; | [I]WO2014018274 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [I] 1,4-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract, Examples 3-6, 9-17, 19-24; Figures 21-23 *; | [I] - Michal Krupka ET AL, "Recombinant polyepitop-forming chimera protein derived from Borrelia burgdorferi OspC variants induces specific antibodies recognizing wide spectrum of antigenic variants of pathogenic Borreliae.", (20130822), URL: http://www.frontiersin.org/10.3389/conf.fimmu.2013.02.00469/event_abstract, (20150708), XP055201147 [I] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3389/conf.fimmu.2013.02.00469 | [I] - EARNHART ET AL, "Construction and analysis of variants of a polyvalent Lyme disease vaccine: Approaches for improving the immune response to chimeric vaccinogens", VACCINE, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, (20070405), vol. 25, no. 17, doi:10.1016/J.VACCINE.2006.12.051, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3419 - 3427, XP022022120 [I] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract; pages 3423-26; Figures 1, 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2006.12.051 | [I] - Christopher G. Earnhart ET AL, "An Octavalent Lyme Disease Vaccine Induces Antibodies That Recognize All Incorporated ospC Type-Specific Sequences", Human Vaccines, (20071101), pages 281 - 289, URL: http://www.landesbioscience.com/journals/vaccines/article/4661/, (20150723), XP055100831 [I] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract; pages 282-287; Figures 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/hv.4661 | [A] - C. G. EARNHART ET AL, "Demonstration of OspC Type Diversity in Invasive Human Lyme Disease Isolates and Identification of Previously Uncharacterized Epitopes That Define the Specificity of the OspC Murine Antibody Response", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (20051118), vol. 73, no. 12, doi:10.1128/IAI.73.12.7869-7877.2005, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 7869 - 7877, XP055199803 [A] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.73.12.7869-7877.2005 | [A] - MICHAL K UPKA ET AL, "Enhancement of immune response towards non-lipidizedrecombinant OspC antigen by binding onto the surface of metallochelating nanoliposomes with entrapped lipophilic derivatives of norAbuMDP", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 160, no. 2, doi:10.1016/J.JCONREL.2012.02.017, ISSN 0168-3659, (20120218), pages 374 - 381, (20120222), XP028512654 [A] 1-3,7-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2012.02.017 | [I] - NINA WRESSNIGG ET AL, "Safety and immunogenicity of a novel multivalent OspA vaccine against Lyme borreliosis in healthy adults: a double-blind, randomised, dose-escalation phase 1/2 trial", LANCET INFECTIOUS DISEASES, ELSEVIER LTD, US, vol. 13, no. 8, doi:10.1016/S1473-3099(13)70110-5, ISSN 1473-3099, (20130801), pages 680 - 689, (20130510), XP002714295 [I] 1,4-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract; page 681-82; 686-88; table 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1473-3099(13)70110-5 | [I] - P NOEL BARRETT ET AL, "A novel multivalent OspA vaccine against Lyme borreliosis shows promise in Phase I/II studies", EXPERT REVIEW OF VACCINES, (20130901), vol. 12, no. 9, doi:10.1586/14760584.2013.824704, ISSN 1476-0584, pages 973 - 975, XP055218377 [I] 1,4-9 * the whole document * * see in particular abstract, page 974 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14760584.2013.824704 | [A] - DING W ET AL, "Structural identification of a key protective B-cell epitope in lyme disease antigen OspA", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, UNITED KINGDOM, (20001006), vol. 302, no. 5, doi:10.1006/JMBI.2000.4119, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 1153 - 1164, XP004472344 [A] 1,4-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.2000.4119 | Examination | WO0216422 | - LUFT B J ET AL, "A NEW MULTI-TARGET OSPA-OSPC VACCINE FOR LYME DISEASE", ABSTRACTS OF THE INTERSCIENCE CONFERENCE ON ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTSAND CHEMOTHER, XX, XX, (20000917), vol. 40, XP008004693 | by applicant | WO2009115782 | - BARBOUR AG; FISH D, SCIENCE, (19930611), vol. 260, no. 5114, pages 1610 - 6 | - BARTUNEK P. HISTORIE; BARTUNEK P. ET AL., Lymeská borelioza, PRAHA: GRADA PUBLISHING,, (2006), vol. 11 | - BURGDORFER W; BARBOUR AG; HAYES SF; BENACH JL; GRUNWALDT E; DAVIS JP, SCIENCE, (1982), vol. 216, pages 1317 - 1319 | - KUMARU OS; SCHULZE RJ; RODNIN MV; LADOKHIN AS; ZUCKERT WR, J BACTERIOL, (201106), vol. 193, no. 11, pages 2814 - 25 | - LIVEY I; O'ROURKE M; TRAWEGER A; SAVIDIS-DACHO H; CROWE BA; BARRETT PN; YANG X; DUNN JJ; LUFT BJ, CLIN INFECT DIS, (201102), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 266 - 70 | - CHEN S; ZUCKERT WR., J BACTERIOL., (201112), vol. 193, no. 23, pages 6724 - 32 | - TILLY K; BESTOR A; ROSA PA, MOL MICROBIOL., (201307), vol. 89, no. 2, pages 216 - 27 | - GILMORE RD, INFECT IMMUN, (1996), vol. 64, pages 2234 - 2239 | - OBONYO M; MUNDERLOH UG; FINGERLE V; WILSKE B; KURTTI TJ, J CLINMICROBIOL, (199907), vol. 37, no. 7, pages 2137 - 41 | - XU Q; MCSHAN K; LIANG FT, MICROBIOLOGY, (200811), vol. 154, pages 3420 - 9 | - BARBOUR ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (1983), vol. 41, no. 2, pages 795 - 804 | - HOWE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 227, no. 4687, pages 645 - 6 | - LAHTEENMAKI ET AL., FEMS MICROBIOL REV., (2001), vol. 25, no. 5, pages 531 - 52 | - PREAC-MURSIC, WILSKE ET AL., INFECTION, (1992), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 342 - 9 | - MARCONI, RT; SAMUELS, DS; GARON, CF, JBACTERIOL., (1993), vol. 175, no. 926, page 1.932 | - PREAC-MURSIC V; WILSKE B; PATSOURIS E ET AL., INFECTION, (1992), vol. 20, pages 342 - 349 | - SEINOST, G.,SCHRIEFER. M E AND LUFL, B. J, INFECT. IMMUN., (1999), vol. 67, pages 3518 - 3524 | - LEVY SA; LISSMAN BA; FICKE CM, JAM VET MED ASSOC., (19930601), vol. 202, no. 11, pages 1834 - 8 | - WORMSER, GP, ANN INTERN MED, (1995), vol. 123, pages 627 - 629 | - FIKRIG E ET AL., SCIENCE, (19901026), vol. 250, no. 4980, pages 553 - 6 | - FIKRIG E ET AL., INFECT LMMUN., (199203), vol. 60, no. 3, pages 773 - 7 | - KELLER D ET AL., JAMA, (19920615), vol. 271, no. 22, pages 1764 - 8 | - FIKRIG E ET AL., PROCNATLACADSCI USA, vol. 89, no. 12, pages 5418 - 21 | - STEEREAC ET AL., N ENGL J MED., (19980723), vol. 339, no. 4, pages 209 - 15 | - HAJDUSEK ET AL., VACCINE, (2010), vol. 28, pages 2993 - 2998 | - LEDVINA M; JEZEK J; SAMAN D.; HRIBALOVA V, COLLECT. CZECH. CHEM. COMMUN., (1998), vol. 63, pages 590 - 598 | - LEDVINA M; ZYKA D.; JEZEK J; TRNKA T; SAMAN D., COLLECT. CZECH. CHEM. COMMUN., (1998), vol. 63, pages 577 - 589 | - TURANEK J; MASEK J; RASKA M; LEDVINA M, Biomedical Science, Engineering and Technology, Application of Liposomes for Construction of Vaccines, INTECH, (201201), pages 653 - 678 | - GREGORIADIS; ALLISON, NATURE, (1974), vol. 252, page 252 | - KRUPKA ET AL., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (2012), vol. 160, pages 374 - 381 | - MASEK ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (2011), vol. 408, pages 95 - 104 | - KOPACEK ET AL., INSECT BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (2003), vol. 33, pages 103 - 113 | - GALAY ET AL., PLOS ONE, (2014), vol. 9, page E90661 |