EP3148601 - BIOENGINEERED ALLOGENEIC VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.05.2021 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 09.06.2021 [2021/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VeriGraft AB Arvid Wallgrens backe 20 413 46 Göteborg / SE | [2019/28] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Novahep AB Arvid Wallgrens backe 20 41346 Gothenburg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMITRAN-HOLGERSSON, Suchitra Laboratory for Transplantation and Regenerative Medicine 2 Floor Sahlgenska Science Park Medicinaregatan 8A 413 46 Gotenborg / SE | 02 /
ROSALES, Antonio Department of Vascular Surgery Oslo Vascular Centre Oslo University Hospital Aker, Postboks, Nydalen 0424 4950 Oslo / NO | 03 /
HISDAL, Jonny Department of Vascular Surgery Oslo Vascular Centre Oslo University Hospital Aker, Postboks, Nydalen 0424 4950 Oslo / NO | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Novitas Patent AB P.O. Box 55557 102 04 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15727920.9 | 27.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015EP61736 | Priority number, date | US201462003129P | 27.05.2014 Original published format: US 201462003129 P | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015181245 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3148601 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/36, A61L27/38, A61L27/50, A61F2/06, C12N5/071 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A61F2/2475 (EP,CN,US);
A61L27/3625 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61F2/062 (KR);
A61F2/2412 (CN);
A61F2/2415 (CN);
A61K45/00 (US);
A61L27/367 (CN,US);
A61L27/3683 (KR);
A61L27/3804 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61L27/3808 (CN);
A61L27/3826 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61L27/3834 (EP,KR,US);
A61L27/3886 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61L27/507 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N5/0691 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61L2300/64 (CN);
A61L2430/34 (CN,US);
A61L2430/40 (CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Title | German: | BIOMANIPULIERTE ALLOGENES VENTIL | [2017/14] | English: | BIOENGINEERED ALLOGENEIC VALVE | [2017/14] | French: | VALVE ALLOGÉNIQUE OBTENUE PAR GÉNIE GÉNÉTIQUE | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 13.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.09.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 26.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 14.05.2020 | 14.05.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.01.2021 | 18.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/23] | 01.02.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/23] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.03.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.04.2019 | Decision despatched | 26.10.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 26.10.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2018 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   27.06.2018 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2013136184 (NOVAHEP AB [SE]) [X] 1-26 * paragraph [0023] * * example 2 ** claims 1-15 * | by applicant | US6376244 | US6753181 | - ROSALES A. ET AL., "Venous valve reconstruction in patients with secondary chronic venous insufficiency", EUR. J. OF VASCULAR AND E SURGERY, (2008), vol. 36, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejvs.2008.06.015, pages 466 - 72, XP025583119 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejvs.2008.06.015 | - ROSALES A. ET AL., "External venous valve plasty (EVVP) in patients with primary chronic venous insufficiency (PCVI)", EUR. J. OF VASCULAR AND ENDOVASCULAR SURGERY, (2006), vol. 32, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejvs.2006.04.002, pages 570 - 576, XP005743750 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejvs.2006.04.002 | - MALETI O.; PERRIN M., "Reconstructive surgery for deep vein reflux in the lower limbs: techniques, results and indications", EUR. J. OF VASCULAR AND ENDOVASCULAR SURGERY, (2011), vol. 41, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejvs.2011.02.013, pages 837 - 48, XP028210514 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejvs.2011.02.013 | - GESELSCHAP JH; VAN ZUIDEN JM; TOONDER IM; WITTENS, CHA, "In vitro evaluation of a new autologous valve-stent for deep venous incompetence", JOURNAL OF ENDOVASCULAR THERAPY: AN OFFICIAL JOURNAL FO THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY OF ENDOV SCULAR SPECIALISTS, (2006), vol. 13, pages 762 - 769 |