EP3154767 - AN INDUCTION HEATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tetra Laval Holdings & Finance SA 70, Avenue Général-Guisan 1009 Pully / CH | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIERLEIN, Pär Möllevägen 7 S-247 54 Dalby / SE | 02 /
MARTIN, Alexandersson Ljunggatan 5 S-244 65 Furulund / SE | 03 /
SANDBERG, Daniel Promenaden 10 S-247 47 Flyinge / SE | 04 /
ISRAELSSON, Karl Köpenhamnsvägen 73B S-217 71 Malmö / SE | 05 /
CARLIOZ, Louis Rotgatan 1 S-232 37 Arlöv / SE | 06 /
DE SALVO, Vincenzo Lokstallsgatan 12 S-216 46 Limhamn / SE | 07 /
JOHANSSON, Karl-Axel Lupinvägen 4 246 50 Löddeköpinge / SE | [2019/47] |
Former [2017/16] | 01 /
BIERLEIN, Pär Möllevägen 7 S-247 54 Dalby / SE | ||
02 /
MARTIN, Alexandersson Ljunggatan 5 S-244 65 Furulund / SE | |||
03 /
SANDBERG, Daniel Promenaden 10 S-247 47 Flyinge / SE | |||
04 /
ISRAELSSON, Karl Köpenhamnsvägen 73B S-217 71 Malmö / SE | |||
05 /
CARLIOZ, Louis Rotgatan 1 S-232 37 Arlöv / SE | |||
06 /
DE SALVO, Vincenzo Lokstallsgatan 12 S-216 46 Limhamn / SE | |||
07 /
JOHANSSON, Karl-Axel Köpenhamnsvägen 73B 21771 Malmö / SE | Representative(s) | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 221 86 Lund / SE | [2019/47] |
Former [2017/16] | Tetra Pak - Patent Attorneys SE AB Tetra Pak Patent Department Ruben Rausings gata 22186 Lund / SE | Application number, filing date | 15729413.3 | 10.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015EP62906 | Priority number, date | SE20140050723 | 12.06.2014 Original published format: SE 1450723 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015189253 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3154767 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3154767 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/36, H05B6/36, B65B9/20, B65B51/22, B65B51/30 | [2019/34] | CPC: |
B29C65/3668 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C65/3656 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C65/368 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C66/3472 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C66/4312 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C66/43121 (US);
B29C66/72321 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C66/8122 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C66/8126 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B29C66/849 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B65B51/227 (EP,CN,US);
B65B51/30 (EP,CN,US);
B65B9/20 (EP,CN,US);
H05B6/105 (US);
B29C65/745 (EP,CN,US);
B29C66/81431 (EP,CN,US);
B29K2995/0008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/8122, B29K2881/04 (EP,US);
B29C66/8122, B29K2909/02 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2017/16] | B29C65/36, H05B6/36, B65B51/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUKTIONSERWÄRMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/16] | English: | AN INDUCTION HEATING DEVICE | [2017/16] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAUFFAGE PAR INDUCTION | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 30.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2015 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | IE | 10.06.2020 | LU | 10.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.06.2015 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
IE | 10.06.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
LU | 10.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [T]US3808074 (SMITH J, et al) [T] * column 3, lines 42-55 *; | [A]EP0212490 (TETRA PAK INT [SE]) [A] 1,9 * figure 1 *; | [XI]EP1413520 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0048]; figure 3 * [I] 2-6,8-17; | [T] - Polytron Kunststofftechnik Gmbh & Co. Kg, "Ferromagnetische Kunststoffe - Ferrotron & Fluxtrol - Polytron Kunststofftechnik", (20150731), URL: http://www.polytron-gmbh.de/ferrotron_und_fluxtrol.aspx, (20150731), XP055205760 [T] * the whole document * |