EP3143726 - METHODS FOR CONTROLLING NETWORK SWITCHES USING A SWITCH MODELING INTERFACE AT A CONTROLLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/12] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING NETWORK SWITCHES USING A SWITCH MODELING INTERFACE AT A CONTROLLER | ||
[2019/40] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2020 [2020/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Big Switch Networks LLC 5453 Great America Parkway Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/27] |
Former [2019/19] | For all designated states Big Switch Networks, Inc. 3111 Coronado Drive Building A Santa Clara, California 95054 / US | ||
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states Big Switch Networks Inc. 3965 Freedom Circle Suite 300 Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WUNDSAM, Andreas 405 Stierlin Rd Apt 10 Mountain View, CA 94043-4633 / US | 02 /
LANE, Richard, Leegan 505 Cypress Point Drive, Unit 252 Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 03 /
SHERWOOD, Robert, W. 4465 View Place Oakland, CA 94611 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | 01 /
WUNDSAM, Andreas 405 Stierlin Rd Apt 10 Mountain View, CA 94043-4633 / US | ||
02 /
LANE, Richard, Leegan 240 Monroe Drive Apt. 11 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | |||
03 /
SHERWOOD, Robert, W. 4465 View Place Oakland, CA 94611 / US | Representative(s) | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/12] | Rooney, John-Paul Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 15730309.0 | 14.05.2015 | [2017/12] | WO2015US30874 | Priority number, date | US201414295196 | 03.06.2014 Original published format: US201414295196 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015187337 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3143726 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/24 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
H04L41/0895 (EP);
H04L41/0816 (EP,CN,US);
H04L41/0823 (US);
H04L47/13 (US);
H04L49/25 (US);
H04L49/351 (US);
H04L41/085 (EP,CN,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON NETZWERKWEICHEN MITTELS EINER NETZWERKWEICHENMODELLIERUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE AUF EINEM KONTROLLER | [2019/40] | English: | METHODS FOR CONTROLLING NETWORK SWITCHES USING A SWITCH MODELING INTERFACE AT A CONTROLLER | [2019/40] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR COMMANDER LES COMMUTATEURS DE RÉSEAU EN UTILISANT UNE INTERFACE DE MODÉLISATION DE COMMUTATEUR DANS UN CONTRÔLEUR | [2019/40] |
Former [2017/12] | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON NETZWERKSCHALTUNGEN MITHILFE EINER SCHALTMODELLIERUNGSSCHNITTSTELLE AN EINEM STEUERGERÄT | ||
Former [2017/12] | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING NETWORK SWITCHES USING A SWITCH MODELING INTERFACE AT A CONTROLLER | ||
Former [2017/12] | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE COMMANDE DE COMMUTATEURS DE RÉSEAU À L'AIDE D'UNE INTERFACE DE MODÉLISATION DE COMMUTATION AU NIVEAU D'UN CONTRÔLEUR | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 05.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/53] | 11.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2013163427 (BELIVEAU LUDOVIC [US], et al) [X] 1,19 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0104] * * figures 1, 8 *[I] 2-11,20,21; | [XYI] - ANDREAS VOELLMY ET AL, "Maple", SIGCOMM, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20130827), doi:10.1145/2486001.2486030, ISBN 978-1-4503-2056-6, pages 87 - 98, XP058030647 [X] 1-8,10,11,19-21 * Section 2 - Section 4 * * figure 1 * [Y] 12 [I] 9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2486001.2486030 | [XYI] - YASUNOBO CHIBA ET AL, "A Study on Control Plane OAM Mechanism for OpenFlow Networks", IEICE TECHNICAL REPORT, DENSHI JOUHOU TSUUSHIN GAKKAI, JP, (20110224), vol. 110, no. 448, ISSN 0913-5685, pages 329 - 334, XP008173888 [X] 13-15,17,18 * abstract * * Section 2 * * Section 4.1 * * figures 1, 2, 4, 6 * [Y] 12 [I] 16 | [A] - "OpenFlow Switch Specification", (20111205), URL: https://www.opennetworking.org/images/stories/downloads/sdn-resources/onf-specifications/openflow/openflow-spec-v1.2.pdf, (20150727), XP055177510 [A] 1-21 * page 62 * | [XI] - Ankur Singla ET AL, "OpenContrail Architecture Documentation", (20140208), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20140208021157/http://opencontrail.org/opencontrail-architecture-documentation/, (20150727), XP055204674 [X] 1,19 * page 2 - page 12 * [I] 2-11,20,21 |