EP3155508 - SENSOR CORRELATION FOR PEN AND TOUCH-SENSITIVE COMPUTING DEVICE INTERACTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.10.2021 [2021/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microsoft Technology Licensing, LLC One Microsoft Way Redmond, WA 98052-6399 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HINCKLEY, Ken c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 02 /
BENKO, Hrvoje c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 03 /
PAHUD, Michel c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 04 /
WILSON, Andrew, D. c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 05 /
IRANI, Pourang, Polad c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | 06 /
GUIMBRETIERE, Francois c/o Microsoft Technology Licensing LLC LCA - International Patents (8/1172) One Microsoft Way Redmond, Washington 98052-6399 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Rees, Alexander Ellison, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 15730928.7 | 08.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015US34612 | Priority number, date | US201414303203 | 12.06.2014 Original published format: US201414303203 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015191409 | Date: | 17.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155508 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
G06F3/0487 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/04883 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/03545 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0383 (KR,US);
G06F3/0416 (CN,KR);
G06F3/04162 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Title | German: | SENSORKORRELATION FÜR STIFT- UND BERÜHRUNGSEMPFINDLICHE RECHNERVORRICHTUNGSINTERAKTION | [2017/16] | English: | SENSOR CORRELATION FOR PEN AND TOUCH-SENSITIVE COMPUTING DEVICE INTERACTION | [2017/16] | French: | CORRÉLATION DE CAPTEURS POUR INTERACTION DE STYLO ET DE DISPOSITIF INFORMATIQUE TACTILE | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 02.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2012262407 (HINCKLEY KENNETH PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0202] *; | [A]US2012206330 (CAO XIANG [CN], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0058] *; | [A]US2014078117 (ASANO YASUHARU [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0112] - paragraph [0114] *; | [I]US2013257777 (BENKO HRVOJE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * | [X] - HYUNYOUNG SONG ET AL, "Grips and gestures on a multi-touch pen", HUMAN FACTORS IN COMPUTING SYSTEMS, ACM, 2 PENN PLAZA, SUITE 701 NEW YORK NY 10121-0701 USA, (20110507), doi:10.1145/1978942.1979138, ISBN 978-1-4503-0228-9, pages 1323 - 1332, XP058041407 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1978942.1979138 | [A] - KEN HINCKLEY ET AL, "Pen + touch = new tools", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 23ND ANNUAL ACM SYMPOSIUM ON USER INTERFACE SOFTWARE AND TECHNOLOGY, UIST '10, New York, New York, USA, (20100101), doi:10.1145/1866029.1866036, ISBN 978-1-45-030271-5, page 27, XP055206853 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/1866029.1866036 |