EP3157881 - GLASSES HAVING NON-FRANGIBLE STRESS PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated 1 Riverfront Plaza Corning, New York 14831 / US | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFFY, Delena Lucinda Justice 10336 Church Creek Road Lindley, New York 14858 / US | 02 /
ROUSSEV, Rostislav Vatchev 6 Fox Lane West Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 03 /
SCHNEIDER, Vitor Marino 6 Timber Lane Painted Post, New York 14870 / US | 04 /
SMITH, Kristy Lynn 4996 Middle Road Bath, NY 14810 / US | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [2023/17] |
Former [2017/17] | Scheuermann, Erik Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 15731213.3 | 12.06.2015 | [2017/17] | WO2015US35448 | Priority number, date | US201462014372P | 19.06.2014 Original published format: US 201462014372 P | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015195465 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3157881 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3157881 | Date: | 26.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | C03C21/00 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
C03C3/083 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C21/002 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C03C4/18 (CN,KR,US);
C03C3/097 (CN,KR,US);
C03C3/085 (CN,KR,US);
C03C3/087 (CN,KR,US);
C03C3/091 (CN,KR,US);
C03C3/093 (CN,KR,US);
C03C3/095 (CN,KR,US);
C03C2204/00 (CN,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRILLE MIT NICHTZERBRECHLICHEN BELASTUNGSPROFILEN | [2017/17] | English: | GLASSES HAVING NON-FRANGIBLE STRESS PROFILES | [2017/17] | French: | VERRES AYANT DES PROFILS DE CONTRAINTE NON FRANGIBLES | [2017/17] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2016 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.12.2016 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 30.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP20205505.9 / EP3798196 | Opposition(s) | 29.01.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.04.2023 | CZ | 26.04.2023 | DK | 26.04.2023 | EE | 26.04.2023 | ES | 26.04.2023 | FI | 26.04.2023 | HR | 26.04.2023 | IT | 26.04.2023 | LT | 26.04.2023 | LV | 26.04.2023 | MC | 26.04.2023 | NL | 26.04.2023 | PL | 26.04.2023 | RO | 26.04.2023 | RS | 26.04.2023 | SE | 26.04.2023 | SI | 26.04.2023 | SK | 26.04.2023 | SM | 26.04.2023 | IE | 12.06.2023 | LU | 12.06.2023 | BE | 30.06.2023 | CH | 30.06.2023 | NO | 26.07.2023 | GR | 27.07.2023 | IS | 26.08.2023 | PT | 28.08.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/24] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SI | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IE | 12.06.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
BE | 30.06.2023 | ||
CH | 30.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
IE | 12.06.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/15] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.06.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
EE | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RO | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
CZ | 26.04.2023 | ||
DK | 26.04.2023 | ||
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
MC | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
SK | 26.04.2023 | ||
SM | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
FI | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
LT | 26.04.2023 | ||
LV | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
HR | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
RS | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
GR | 27.07.2023 | ||
IS | 26.08.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 26.04.2023 | |
ES | 26.04.2023 | ||
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
SE | 26.04.2023 | ||
NO | 26.07.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 26.04.2023 | |
NL | 26.04.2023 | ||
PT | 28.08.2023 | ||
Former [2023/43] | NL | 26.04.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2011294649 (GOMEZ SINUE [US], et al) [X] 1,19,27,38 * table 1a: composition B; [0019], [0023]-[0025] * [Y] 20-26,39-62 [I] 2-18,28-37; | [Y]US2013045375 (GROSS TIMOTHY MICHAEL [US]) [Y] 19-26,38-45,53,54,62 * [0023], [0034]-[0040] *; | [XYI]US2013101798 (HASHIMOTO KAZUAKI [JP]) [X] 1,19,27,38 * Fig. 5: ex 2, 3; [0080], [0086], [0087], [0112], [0113], [0118]-[0121], [0132], [0139]-[0142] * [Y] 20-26,39-62 [I] 2-18,28-37; | [Y]US2013224492 (BOOKBINDER DANA CRAIG [US], et al) [Y] 19-26,38-45,53,54,62* [0034]-[0041] *; | [Y]WO2013184205 (CORNING INC [US]) [Y] 19-26,38-45,53,54,62 * [0020], [0032], [0039], [0045]-[0056] *; | [XYI]US2014087159 (CLEARY THOMAS MICHAEL [US], et al) [X] 1,19,27,38,46,53-55,62 * [0012], [0022], [0024], [0055], [0056], [0060], [0061]; example 1, 2 * [Y] 20-26,39-45 [I] 2-18,28-37,47-52 |