EP3164239 - REINFORCED STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.05.2019 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOTECH ENGINEERING S.L. Parque Empresarial Boroa P2-A4 48340 Amorebieta-Etxano / ES | [2019/25] |
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states Autotech Engineering, A.I.E. AIC-Automotive Intelligence Center Parque Empresarial Boroa P2-A4 48340 Amorebieta-Etxano / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GARCIA, Michel Avenida Mestre Falla nº 60 E-08880 Sitges / ES | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | de Rooij, Mathieu Julien Bardehle Pagenberg S.L. Avenida Diagonal 598, 3° 1ª 08021 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 2nd floor 08002 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 15732001.1 | 02.07.2015 | [2017/19] | WO2015EP65096 | Priority number, date | EP20140382256 | 03.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14382256 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016001360 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3164239 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B22F3/105, B22F7/08, B23K26/14 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
B23K26/34 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F10/25 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F10/00 (CN);
B22F1/00 (EP,CN,US);
B22F10/322 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F10/36 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/41 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F12/53 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B22F7/08 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B23K26/0006 (KR,US);
B23K26/144 (KR,US);
B22F2301/35 (KR,US);
B23K2101/006 (KR,US);
B23K2101/34 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2103/05 (EP,KR,US);
Y02P10/25 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Title | German: | VERSTÄRKTE BAUTEILE | [2017/19] | English: | REINFORCED STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS | [2017/19] | French: | COMPOSANTS STRUCTURAUX RENFORCÉS | [2017/19] | Entry into regional phase | 03.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 03.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 13.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102011086813 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102013219250 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [00 7] , [00 9] , [0 11] *; | [XI]DE202013010638U (ALPHAFORM AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,12,14-16 * paragraphs [0011] , [0 22] - [0028] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 3-6,10,11,13; | [A] - "Automotive Worldwide Steels for hot stamping -Usibor", (20140128), URL: http://automotive.arcelormittal.com/saturnus/sheets/E_EN.pdf, (20141128), XP055155878 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |