EP3155846 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONNECTION POINT DISCOVERY AND ASSOCIATION IN A DIRECTIONAL WIRELESS NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EL AYACH, Omar c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Sundar c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
SMEE, John Edward c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
SAMPATH, Ashwin c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 05 /
LI, Junyi c/o QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/16] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Maucher Jenkins 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 15732486.4 | 05.06.2015 | [2017/16] | WO2015US34527 | Priority number, date | US201414306097 | 16.06.2014 Original published format: US201414306097 | [2017/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015195376 | Date: | 23.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3155846 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3155846 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H04W48/16, H04W16/28, // H04W48/20 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H04W48/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W16/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (KR);
H04W72/046 (KR);
H04W48/20 (EP,CN,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/16] | H04W48/16, H04W72/08, H04W16/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBINDUNGSPUNKTENTDECKUNG UND VERBINDUNG IN EINEM DIREKTIONALEN DRAHTLOSEN NETZWERK | [2017/16] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONNECTION POINT DISCOVERY AND ASSOCIATION IN A DIRECTIONAL WIRELESS NETWORK | [2017/16] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR UNE DÉCOUVERTE ET UNE ASSOCIATION DE POINT DE CONNEXION DANS UN RÉSEAU SANS FIL DIRECTIONNEL | [2017/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/16] | 14.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.06.2015 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | ES | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | IT | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | NL | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | PT | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SE | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | IE | 05.06.2018 | LU | 05.06.2018 | MT | 05.06.2018 | SI | 05.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2021/01] |
Former [2020/34] | HU | 05.06.2015 | |
AL | 18.10.2017 | ||
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.06.2015 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 05.06.2015 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PT | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
MT | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
IE | 05.06.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
LU | 05.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
IT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
ES | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SE | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NL | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 18.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2010214169 (KAFLE PADAM LAL [US]); | [X]US2011110340 (LAKKIS ISMAIL [US]); | [X]US2012028588 (MORIOKA YUICHI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012064841 (HUSTED PAUL J [US], et al); | [A]WO2014036150 (INTERDIGITAL PATENT HOLDINGS [US]) | Examination | WO2014009250 |