EP3111440 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANUAL WELDER TRAINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lincoln Global, Inc. 9160 Norwalk Boulevard Santa Fe Springs, CA 90670 / US | [2017/29] |
Former [2017/01] | For all designated states Lincoln Global, Inc. 17721 Railroad Street City of Industry, CA 91748 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOULWARE, Paul C. 2212 Partlow Drive Columbus, OH 43220 / US | 02 /
CONRARDY, Christopher C. 865 Crownwood Drive Columbus, OH 43228 / US | 03 /
CLARK, Douglas A. 2682 Shrewsbury Road Columbus, OH 43221 / US | 04 /
FORQUER, M. William 2187 Glenmere Road Columbus, OH 43221 / US | [2017/01] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/01] | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 15732934.3 | 29.05.2015 | [2017/01] | WO2015IB00777 | Priority number, date | US201414293700 | 02.06.2014 Original published format: US201414293700 | [2017/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015185972 | Date: | 10.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3111440 | Date: | 04.01.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G09B19/24 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
G09B19/24 (EP,US);
G09B25/02 (CN);
B23K9/0956 (US);
B23K9/10 (US);
G06Q50/00 (CN);
G09B5/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/01] | Title | German: | TRAININGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN FÜR MANUELLE SCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/01] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MANUAL WELDER TRAINING | [2017/01] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'APPRENTISSAGE POUR SOUDEUR MANUEL | [2017/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/01] | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.01.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 02.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2014007830 (EDISON WELDING INST INC [US], et al) [I] 1-27 * paragraph [0005] *; | [A]US2012298640 (CONRARDY CHRISTOPHER C [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * claim 1 * | Examination | US2014017642 |