EP3166881 - HEAVY DUTY VEHICLE WITH A LIFTING APPARATUS FOR LIFTING AND LOWERING A CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konecranes Global Corporation Koneenkatu 8 05830 Hyvinkää / FI | [2018/13] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states Terex MHPS GmbH Forststrasse 16 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEGEWALD, Mike Am Mönchgraben 7 40597 Düsseldorf / DE | 02 /
KÖHN, Peter Werstener Feld 86 40591 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Moser Götze & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Paul-Klinger-Strasse 9 45127 Essen / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15734183.5 | 06.07.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015EP65384 | Priority number, date | DE201410109785 | 11.07.2014 Original published format: DE102014109785 | [2017/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016005335 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166881 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3166881 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B66C19/00 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
B66C19/007 (EP,CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWERLASTFAHRZEUG MIT EINER HUBVORRICHTUNG ZUM HEBEN UND SENKEN EINES CONTAINERS | [2017/20] | English: | HEAVY DUTY VEHICLE WITH A LIFTING APPARATUS FOR LIFTING AND LOWERING A CONTAINER | [2017/20] | French: | VÉHICULE POIDS LOURD ÉQUIPÉ D'UN DISPOSITIF DE LEVAGE POUR SOULEVER ET ABAISSER UN CONTENEUR | [2017/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 07.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2015 | AL | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | ES | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | IT | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | NL | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | GB | 06.07.2019 | LU | 06.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | FR | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 06.07.2015 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
GB | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 06.07.2015 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
GB | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
GB | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
GB | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
FR | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
GB | 06.07.2019 | ||
LU | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
GB | 06.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HR | 06.02.2019 | |
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | HR | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | LT | 06.02.2019 | |
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0931757 (SIT SOC INNOVATIONS TECH [FR]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE10243844 (GOTTWALD PORT TECH GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-10* the whole document *; | [Y]EP2128074 (KALMAR IND OY AB [FI]) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * |