EP3148853 - ELECTRO-PNEUMATIC BRAKING SYSTEM FOR A RAILWAY VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faiveley Transport Italia S.p.A. Via Volvera 51 10045 Piossasco (TO) / IT | [2017/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORRENDO, Roberto Via Benso 38 I-10022 Carmagnola (Torino) / IT | 02 /
TIONE, Roberto Via Garibaldi 4 I-10020 Lauriano (Torino) / IT | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2017/14] | Application number, filing date | 15734448.2 | 28.05.2015 | [2017/14] | WO2015IB54008 | Priority number, date | IT2014TO00425 | 28.05.2014 Original published format: IT TO20140425 | [2017/14] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015181764 | Date: | 03.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3148853 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3148853 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/66, B60T8/18 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
B60T8/1893 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B60T13/665 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B60T17/228 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B60T8/1705 (RU,US);
B60T8/3235 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B61H11/14 (RU,US);
B60Y2200/30 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHES BREMSSYSTEM FÜR EIN SCHIENENFAHRZEUG | [2017/14] | English: | ELECTRO-PNEUMATIC BRAKING SYSTEM FOR A RAILWAY VEHICLE | [2017/14] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE POUR UN VÉHICULE FERROVIAIRE | [2017/14] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/14] | 03.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | IE | 28.05.2018 | LU | 28.05.2018 | MT | 28.05.2018 | BE | 31.05.2018 | CH | 31.05.2018 | LI | 31.05.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MK | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 28.05.2018 | ||
LU | 28.05.2018 | ||
MT | 28.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 28.05.2018 | ||
LU | 28.05.2018 | ||
MT | 28.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 28.05.2018 | ||
LU | 28.05.2018 | ||
MT | 28.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 28.05.2018 | ||
LU | 28.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 28.05.2018 | ||
LU | 28.05.2018 | ||
BE | 31.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 28.05.2018 | ||
LU | 28.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 28.05.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
CH | 31.05.2018 | ||
LI | 31.05.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0152300 (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL [GB]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [AD]EP0958980 (SAB WABCO SPA [IT]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002163248 (WOOD JAMES A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0038] - [0065] *; | [AD]WO2013144543 (KNORR BREMSE RAIL SYS UK LTD [GB]) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document * |