EP3166818 - DRIVING DIRECTION INDICATOR MODULE AND OUTSIDE REAR VIEW MIRROR ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/20] | TRAVEL DIRECTION INDICATOR MODULE AND EXTERIOR REARVIEW MIRROR ARRANGEMENT | ||
[2019/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2020 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 07.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMR Patents S.à.r.l. 6, rue Eugène Ruppert 2453 Luxembourg / LU | [2018/21] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states SMR Patents S.à.r.l. Le Dôme 2-8 Avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ERHART, Volker Ringstraße 92 73257 Köngen / DE | 02 /
FRITZ, Daniel August-Lämmle-Weg 19 70374 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Weber-Bruls, Dorothée Jones Day Nextower Thurn-und-Taxis-Platz 6 60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 15734473.0 | 30.06.2015 | [2017/20] | WO2015IB54900 | Priority number, date | EP20140176666 | 11.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14176666 | [2017/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016005854 | Date: | 14.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3166818 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3166818 | Date: | 08.01.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/26, B60R1/12, B60Q1/34, G02B6/00, F21S43/237, F21S43/239, F21S43/243, F21S43/245 | [2019/31] | CPC: |
B60Q1/2665 (EP,CN,US);
G02B6/0078 (CN,US);
B60Q1/34 (US);
B60R1/06 (EP,CN,US);
B60R1/1207 (EP,CN,US);
F21S43/237 (EP,CN,US);
F21S43/239 (EP,CN,US);
F21S43/243 (EP,CN,US);
F21S43/245 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/20] | B60Q1/26, B60R1/12, B60R1/06, F21V8/00, F21S8/10, B60Q1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRTRICHTUNGSANZEIGEMODUL UND AUSSENRÜCKSPIEGELANORDNUNG | [2017/20] | English: | DRIVING DIRECTION INDICATOR MODULE AND OUTSIDE REAR VIEW MIRROR ASSEMBLY | [2019/31] | French: | MODULE DE CLIGNOTANT ET SYSTÈME DE RÉTROVISEUR EXTÉRIEUR | [2019/31] |
Former [2017/20] | TRAVEL DIRECTION INDICATOR MODULE AND EXTERIOR REARVIEW MIRROR ARRANGEMENT | ||
Former [2017/20] | MODULE DE CLIGNOTANT ET DISPOSITIF FORMANT RÉTROVISEUR EXTÉRIEUR | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/20] | 06.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.12.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 02.12.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.06.2015 | AL | 08.01.2020 | CY | 08.01.2020 | CZ | 08.01.2020 | DK | 08.01.2020 | EE | 08.01.2020 | ES | 08.01.2020 | FI | 08.01.2020 | HR | 08.01.2020 | IT | 08.01.2020 | LT | 08.01.2020 | LV | 08.01.2020 | MC | 08.01.2020 | MK | 08.01.2020 | MT | 08.01.2020 | NL | 08.01.2020 | PL | 08.01.2020 | RO | 08.01.2020 | RS | 08.01.2020 | SE | 08.01.2020 | SI | 08.01.2020 | SK | 08.01.2020 | SM | 08.01.2020 | TR | 08.01.2020 | BG | 08.04.2020 | NO | 08.04.2020 | GR | 09.04.2020 | IS | 08.05.2020 | PT | 31.05.2020 | AT | 30.06.2020 | BE | 30.06.2020 | CH | 30.06.2020 | IE | 30.06.2020 | LI | 30.06.2020 | LU | 30.06.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 30.06.2015 | |
AL | 08.01.2020 | ||
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
AT | 30.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 30.06.2015 | |
CY | 08.01.2020 | ||
CZ | 08.01.2020 | ||
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
MT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
TR | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
AT | 30.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
AT | 30.06.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
BE | 30.06.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
CH | 30.06.2020 | ||
IE | 30.06.2020 | ||
LI | 30.06.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/15] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
LU | 30.06.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
IT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
MC | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
PL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SI | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
EE | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 08.01.2020 | |
DK | 08.01.2020 | ||
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SK | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RO | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
SM | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 08.01.2020 | |
ES | 08.01.2020 | ||
FI | 08.01.2020 | ||
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
IS | 08.05.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
BG | 08.04.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
GR | 09.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
HR | 08.01.2020 | ||
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
LV | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
SE | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
RS | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
PT | 31.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 08.01.2020 | |
LT | 08.01.2020 | ||
NL | 08.01.2020 | ||
NO | 08.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | NL | 08.01.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2292466 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-9 * paragraphs [0025] , [0033] , [0040] , [0042] , [0043]; figures 1-9 *; | [XY]EP2489550 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7-9 * paragraphs [0058] - [0068]; figures 10-13 * [Y] 4,6; | [YA]DE102007010023 (FER FAHRZEUGELEKTRIK GMBH [DE]) [Y] 4,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] , [0015] , [0016] , [0018] , [0020] - [0023] - [0024]; figures 1-5 * [A] 1-3,5,7-9; | [I]EP1854667 (SCHEFENACKER PATENTS S A R L [LU]) [I] 1,3-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0008] , [0010] - [0023] - [0030] , [0031] , [0038] - [0040] - [0042] - [0044]; figures 2,5a-6b *; | [A]KR100865008B (VISIOCORP POONG JEONG LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-10 *; | [A]EP1391755 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0003] - [0013] - [0016] - [0020]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE102008045698 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004054732 (FER FAHRZEUGELEKTRIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0007] , [0014] , [0015] - [0017] - [0023]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]JP2010052444 (MITSUBA CORP, et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [A]EP2737990 (KOITO MFG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0014]; figures 1-7 * | Examination | JP2013179092 | by applicant | EP0858932 | DE102011103200 | EP1854667 | EP1391755 | EP2489550 |