EP3164674 - TECHNIQUES FOR DETERMINING MOVEMENTS BASED ON SENSOR MEASUREMENTS FROM A PLURALITY OF MOBILE DEVICES CO-LOCATED WITH A PERSON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.2020 [2020/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2017/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATRAMAN, Sai Pradeep c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
GAO, Weihua c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
WERNER, Benjamin A. c/o QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15734775.8 | 23.06.2015 | [2017/19] | WO2015US37184 | Priority number, date | US201414323984 | 03.07.2014 Original published format: US201414323984 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016003707 | Date: | 07.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3164674 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/16 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,CN,US);
G01C21/16 (EP,CN,US);
H04M1/72454 (US);
H04M1/72457 (US);
H04W4/025 (EP,US);
H04W4/026 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/027 (EP,CN,US);
H04W4/029 (EP,US);
H04W52/0212 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG VON BEWEGUNGEN AUF GRUNDLAGE VON SENSORMESSUNGEN AUS EINER VIELZAHL VON MIT EINER PERSON CO-LOKALISIERTEN MOBILEN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2017/19] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR DETERMINING MOVEMENTS BASED ON SENSOR MEASUREMENTS FROM A PLURALITY OF MOBILE DEVICES CO-LOCATED WITH A PERSON | [2017/19] | French: | TECHNIQUES POUR DÉTERMINER LES MOUVEMENTS SUR LA BASE DE MESURES DE CAPTEURS À PARTIR D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE DISPOSITIFS MOBILES CO-SITUÉS AVEC UNE PERSONNE | [2017/19] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2016 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2016 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.11.2016 | Examination requested [2017/19] | 18.11.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/19] | 20.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US7640003 (PAN YANG [CN]) [A] 46,47* column 3, lines 23-38 *; | [A]US2012158296 (WATERS DERIC W [US], et al) [A] 8 * paragraph [0046] *; | [XAI]US2012259572 (AFZAL MUHAMMAD HARIS [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,10-13,15-19,22-24,26-29,32-34,36-39,42-44 * paragraphs [0043] , [0066] , [0067] , [0103] , [0109] , [0111] - [0116] - [0118] * [A] 14,25,35 [I] 8; | [XI]US2013324890 (YOUSSEF JOE [FR], et al) [X] 1-7,9,10,12,16-21,23,27-31,33,37-41,43 * paragraphs [0021] - [0028] - [0036] , [0045] , [0096] , [0097] , [0100] , [0101] , [0112] , [0116] , [0159] , [0161] , [0163] , [0164] * * paragraphs [0181] , [ 184] , [ 216] , [ 243] * * figure 1 * [I] 8,14,25,35; | [XI]US2013335273 (PAKZAD PAYAM [US], et al) [X] 45,49-52 * paragraphs [0038] , [0 39] , [0 50] , [0 60] * [I] 46-48 | Examination | WO2012109244 |