EP3161739 - PERFORMING AUTOMATED TASKS BASED ON VISUAL CUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2020 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 11.09.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.10.2020 [2020/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazon Technologies, Inc. P.O. Box 81226 Seattle, WA 98108-1226 / US | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MISHRA, Pragyana K. 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 02 /
GRAYBILL, Jules Cook 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | 03 /
GUAN, Danny 410 Terry Avenue North Seattle, Washington 98109-5210 / US | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 15736121.3 | 24.06.2015 | [2017/18] | WO2015US37534 | Priority number, date | US201414315717 | 26.06.2014 Original published format: US201414315717 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015200548 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3161739 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06, G06Q10/08, G06K9/00, G06Q50/28, G06F17/30 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/08 (EP,US);
G06V20/80 (US);
G06V2201/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/18] | Title | German: | DURCHFÜHRUNG AUTOMATISIERTER AUFGABEN AUF DER BASIS VISUELLER HINWEISE | [2017/18] | English: | PERFORMING AUTOMATED TASKS BASED ON VISUAL CUES | [2017/18] | French: | EXÉCUTION DE TÂCHES AUTOMATIQUES SUR LA BASE DE REPÈRES VISUELS | [2017/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/18] | 27.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/42] | 09.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.09.2020 | 10.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US2002143643 (CATAN CAROLYN RAMSEY [US]); | [A]US2009237546 (BLOEBAUM L SCOTT [US], et al); | [I]US2010082152 (MISHRA DEVESH [US], et al); | [I]US2013038633 (MAGGIORE FRANK [US]); | [A]US2014139654 (TAKAHASHI MASAKI [JP]) | Examination | US5311999 | US2007124024 | WO2009070696 |