EP3097032 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SINGLE FEEDING OF ELONGATE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C. Gunnarssons Verkstads AB Olvägen 22 342 50 Vislanda / SE | [2016/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUNNARSSON, Tony Movägen 7 S-342 50 Vislanda / SE | [2016/48] | Representative(s) | Bergenstråhle & Partners AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/48] | Bergenstråhle Group AB P.O. Box 17704 118 93 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 15737039.6 | 20.01.2015 | [2016/48] | WO2015SE50048 | Priority number, date | SE20140050053 | 20.01.2014 Original published format: SE 1450053 | [2016/48] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015108481 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3097032 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B65G47/24, B65G47/28, B65G47/52, B27B31/06 | [2017/39] | CPC: |
B27B31/06 (EP);
B65G43/08 (EP);
B65G47/24 (EP);
B65G2201/0282 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2016/48] | B65G47/24, B65G47/28, B65G47/52 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINZELNEN ZUFÜHREN VON LÄNGLICHEN GEGENSTÄNDEN | [2016/48] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR SINGLE FEEDING OF ELONGATE OBJECTS | [2016/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR L'ACHEMINEMENT D'OBJETS DE FORME ALLONGÉE DE MANIÈRE INDIVIDUELLE | [2016/48] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 09.08.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/48] | 27.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 09.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE4424545 (GREIL KARL [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,8 * column 11, line 38 - column 11, line 65; figures 9,10 * * column 12, line 43 - column 13, line 28 * * column 13, line 29 - column 14, line 9 * [I] 2,3,6,7,9-11; | [XI]CA2386300 (LUMBERLINE MFG LTD [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * page 3, line 8 - page 4, line 14; figures 1,2,3 * * page 6, line 20 - page 8, line 2 * [I] 7-11; | [Y]US2008283362 (KUJAT DARRYL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0018]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] *; | [Y]CA2238231 (GAGNON ANDRE [CA], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 9 - page 11; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US3603446 (MAXEY CARL W, et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 15 - column 1, line 52; figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 72 - column 2, line 32 *; | [Y]EP2592025 (SITMA MACHINERY S P A [IT]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0101]; figures 3,5,6,11 *; | [XI]US2002117377 (NEWNES WILLIAM R [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1-5 * [I] 6-11; | [A]US5419425 (GOATER GEORGE H [CA]) [A] 1,4 * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 42; figures 1A-1D,11 * * column 11, line 4 - column 11, line 32 *; | [A]US4216482 (MASON MARTIN K [US]) [A] 1,4 * figures 1,1A,1B * | International search | [X]US2008283362 (KUJAT DARRYL [CA], et al); | [A]US2005135917 (KAUPPILA RICHARD W [US], et al); | [A]DE19636981 (RUDOLF HEINZKILL MASCHINENTECH [DE]); | [A]US5069440 (LAZZAROTTI S JAMES [US], et al); | [Y]US2009200139 (KISSEE DARRELL E [US], et al); | [Y]WO2013074019 (RENHOLMEN AB [SE]); | [X]CA2238231 (GAGNON ANDRE [CA], et al) |