EP3095185 - PHOTOVOLTAIC-CLAD MASONRY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solablock LLC 79 River Drive Hadley, Massachusetts 01035 / US | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUINLAN, Patrick John Adrian 8 Comins Road Hadley, Massachusetts 01035 / US | 02 /
LEWIS, Johnathan Richard 80 Fearing Street Amherst, Massachusetts 01002 / US | 03 /
LAVERTY, Jason Michael 244 Granville Road Westfield, Massachusetts 01085 / US | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2021/29] |
Former [2016/47] | Kunz, Herbert Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15737192.3 | 16.01.2015 | [2016/47] | WO2015US11759 | Priority number, date | US201414157831 | 17.01.2014 Original published format: US201414157831 | [2016/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015109186 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3095185 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2015 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3095185 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 23.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02S10/00, H01L31/04 | [2016/47] | CPC: |
H02S20/26 (EP,US);
H02S40/36 (US);
H01L31/048 (EP,US);
H01L31/05 (US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FOTOVOLTAISCH KASCHIERTE MAUERWERKSEINHEIT | [2016/47] | English: | PHOTOVOLTAIC-CLAD MASONRY UNIT | [2016/47] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE MAÇONNERIE À REVÊTEMENT PHOTOVOLTAÏQUE | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 05.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.06.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21186652.0 / EP3965289 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2015 | AL | 21.07.2021 | AT | 21.07.2021 | CY | 21.07.2021 | CZ | 21.07.2021 | DK | 21.07.2021 | EE | 21.07.2021 | FI | 21.07.2021 | HR | 21.07.2021 | LT | 21.07.2021 | LV | 21.07.2021 | MC | 21.07.2021 | MK | 21.07.2021 | MT | 21.07.2021 | NL | 21.07.2021 | PL | 21.07.2021 | RO | 21.07.2021 | RS | 21.07.2021 | SE | 21.07.2021 | SI | 21.07.2021 | SK | 21.07.2021 | SM | 21.07.2021 | BG | 21.10.2021 | NO | 21.10.2021 | GR | 22.10.2021 | IS | 21.11.2021 | PT | 22.11.2021 | IE | 16.01.2022 | LU | 16.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | FR | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 16.01.2015 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
MK | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 16.01.2015 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CY | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 16.01.2015 | |
AL | 21.07.2021 | ||
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
IE | 16.01.2022 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
FR | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
LU | 16.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
MC | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.07.2021 | |
AT | 21.07.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SI | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
SM | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
CZ | 21.07.2021 | ||
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
EE | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RO | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
SK | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
DK | 21.07.2021 | ||
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
HR | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
LV | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
PL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
GR | 22.10.2021 | ||
IS | 21.11.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
RS | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
PT | 22.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
FI | 21.07.2021 | ||
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
SE | 21.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.10.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.07.2021 | |
LT | 21.07.2021 | ||
NL | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.10.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5948063U (-) [Y] 7,13 * figures 1,4 *; | [A]DE20106564U (LUELING CLAUDIA [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 2; figure 1; claims 1-2 *; | [A]US2004031219 (BANISTER MARK P [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0042]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2009242015 (WATTMAN GEORGE G [US], et al) [A] 1* figures 3,5-7 *; | [A]WO2009137347 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0002]; figure 18 *; | [XYI]JP2011219916 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-3,5,8,10,12 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] , [0024] , [0026] , [0027] , [0037] , [0079]; figures 5(a),5(b) * [Y] 7,9,13 [I] 4,6,11,14; | [Y]JP2012049354 (TAISEI CORP, et al) [Y] 9 * figures 1, 3D *; | [XY]JP2013110281 (ANGEL CO LTD) [X] 15 * figures 4(A)-4(D) * [Y] 13 | International search | [Y]US5768831 (MELCHIOR BERND [DE]); | [A]US2001023704 (BOE HANS PETER [DE]); | [A]US2008289272 (FLAHERTY BRIAN J [US], et al); | [A]US2010126094 (LOOMIS NICHOLAS [US], et al); | [X]JP2013110281 (ANGEL CO LTD) | by applicant | JP2011219916 | JP2012049354 | JP2013110281 |