EP3095317 - PLANTING UNIT AND PLANTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suntory Holdings Limited 1-40 Dojimahama 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8203 / JP | [2016/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO Masaki c/o SUNTORY MIDORIE LIMITED 2-3 Motoakasaka 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8631 / JP | [2016/47] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/47] | Application number, filing date | 15737853.0 | 14.01.2015 | [2016/47] | WO2015JP50737 | Priority number, date | JP20140005471 | 15.01.2014 Original published format: JP 2014005471 | [2016/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2015108053 | Date: | 23.07.2015 | Language: | JA | [2015/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3095317 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.07.2015 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A01G9/02, A01G1/00, A01G9/10, A01G27/00 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
A01G9/025 (EP,US);
A01G27/005 (US);
A01G9/0295 (EP,US);
Y02P60/20 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2016/47] | A01G9/02, A01G1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] | Title | German: | PFLANZEINHEIT UND PFLANZER | [2016/47] | English: | PLANTING UNIT AND PLANTER | [2016/47] | French: | UNITÉ DE PLANTATION ET JARDINIÈRE | [2016/47] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2016 | Translation filed | 12.08.2016 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2016 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2016 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2016 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2016 | Examination requested [2016/47] | 06.02.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2084957 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XI]US2012186148 (CHANG HSIAO-AN [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8,12 * the whole document * [I] 4,7,9-11; | [A]EP2572570 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2011101607 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD); | [Y]WO2013071496 (CHANG HSIAO-AN [CN]); | [Y]JP2013226060 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD); | [Y]JP2013226061 (SUNTORY HOLDINGS LTD) | by applicant | JP2010239878 |