EP3169502 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTIC VEHICLE PART [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE Tour Saint-Gobain 12 place de l'Iris 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2020/24] |
Former [2017/21] | For all designated states Saint-Gobain Glass France 18 Avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENYAHIA, Rym Am Hohengeren 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
LUX, Thomas Wannengrund 2/1 71554 Weissach im Tal / DE | 03 /
TURAN, Ahmet Asternweg 9 71573 Allmersbach im Tal / DE | 04 /
FOURNIER, Nicolas Albrecht Dürerstrasse 25 71636 Ludwigsburg / DE | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte mbB Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/21] | Gebauer, Dieter Edmund Splanemann Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rumfordstraße 7 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 15738026.2 | 09.07.2015 | [2017/21] | WO2015EP65660 | Priority number, date | EP20140177427 | 17.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14177427 | [2017/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016008790 | Date: | 21.01.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169502 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169502 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/16, B29C45/14, B29L31/30 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
B29C45/14688 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B29C45/1671 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/302 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/308 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/32 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/34 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/36 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B32B27/365 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B3/04 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B7/05 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B29C2045/0079 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B29C2045/14704 (EP,CN,EA,KR,US);
B29K2995/0025 (EP,EA,US);
B29K2995/0026 (EP,EA,US);
B29L2031/3041 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B29L2031/3052 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B29L2031/7782 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2255/10 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2255/26 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2270/00 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2307/4023 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2307/4026 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2307/41 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2307/50 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2307/558 (EP,CN,EA,US);
B32B2307/584 (EP,CN,EA,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KUNSTSTOFF-FAHRZEUGANBAUTEILS | [2017/21] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PLASTIC VEHICLE PART | [2017/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PIÈCE RAPPORTÉE DE VÉHICULE EN MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | [2017/21] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2017 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 31.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 28.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.07.2015 | AL | 21.08.2019 | CY | 21.08.2019 | DK | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | FI | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MK | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | RS | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SM | 21.08.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 09.07.2015 | |
AL | 21.08.2019 | ||
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
MT | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
SM | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
DK | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 21.08.2019 | |
FI | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
RS | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 21.08.2019 | |
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0415716 (HASHIMOTO FORMING KOGYO CO [JP]) [I] 1,11 * column 1, lines 16-33 * * column 2, lines 40-47 * * page 4, lines 10-27 * * column 7, lines 21-25 * * column 8, lines 34-53 * * column 11, lines 9-17; figure 11 *; | [Y]EP1190831 (DURA AUTOMOTIVE BODY & GLASS [DE]) [Y] 1,14 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0006] , [0008] , [0009] , [0011]; figure 2 *; | [XY]EP1743756 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [X] 1-11,14,16 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0010] , [0013] , [0014] , [0016] , [0017] , [0018]; figure 6; claims 3,5,7,9 * [Y] 12,13,15; | [Y]DE102008023499 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] , [0014] , [0091] , [0103] *; | [A]US2010080970 (HAYES MARC A [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0021] , [0050]; figures 3,4,6 *; | [Y]DE102012014659 (KOSTAL LEOPOLD GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 12,13* paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0006] , [0012] , [0020]; figures 4-7 *; | [Y] - HOPMANN C ET AL, "Automobilscheiben aus Kunststoff", KUNSTOFFE, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MUNCHEN, DE, (20050201), no. 2/05, ISSN 0023-5563, pages 22 - 27, XP002396333 [Y] 1,14 * page 25, column 3, lines 1-12,16-21 * * page 26, column 3, paragraphs 1-13 * |