EP3172291 - SILOXANE LIGANDS TO BE USED FOR DISPERSING QUANTUM DOTS IN SILICONE HOSTS TO OBTAIN COLOR CONVERTERS FOR LED LIGHTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. The Base, Tower B5 unit 107 Evert van de Beekstraat 1 1118 CL Schiphol / NL | [2019/09] |
Former [2018/31] | For all designated states Lumileds Holding B.V. WTC Schiphol, Tower G4 Schiphol Boulevard 127 1118 BG Schiphol / NL | ||
Former [2017/22] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUB, Johan c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
BAESJOU, Patrick John c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | 03 /
BOHMER, Marcel Rene c/o High Tech Campus 5 NL-5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2017/22] | Representative(s) | ter Heegde, Paul Gerard Michel Lumileds Germany GmbH Philipsstraße 8 52068 Aachen / DE | [2017/22] | Application number, filing date | 15738388.6 | 21.07.2015 | [2017/22] | WO2015EP66617 | Priority number, date | EP20140177940 | 22.07.2014 Original published format: EP 14177940 | [2017/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2016012433 | Date: | 28.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3172291 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.2016 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3172291 | Date: | 19.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/02, C09K11/54, C08L83/04, H01L33/50, C09K11/88, C08L83/08, C09K11/08 | [2018/12] | CPC: |
H01L33/502 (EP,KR,US);
C09K11/025 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/388 (US);
C08K11/00 (US);
C08L83/04 (KR);
C08L83/08 (EP,US);
C09K11/08 (EP,US);
C09K11/883 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/501 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/507 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y20/00 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
C08G77/26 (EP,US);
C08K2201/001 (US);
C08K2201/011 (US);
Y10S977/774 (EP,US);
Y10S977/783 (EP,US);
Y10S977/892 (EP,US);
Y10S977/95 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/22] | C09K11/02, C09K11/54, C08L83/04, H01L33/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SILOXANLIGANDEN ZUR VERWENDUNG FÜR DISPERGIERENDE QUANTENPUNKTE IN SILIKON-HOSTS ZUR GEWINNUNG VON FARBUMWANDLERN FÜR LED-BELEUCHTUNG | [2017/22] | English: | SILOXANE LIGANDS TO BE USED FOR DISPERSING QUANTUM DOTS IN SILICONE HOSTS TO OBTAIN COLOR CONVERTERS FOR LED LIGHTING | [2017/22] | French: | LIGANDS DE SILOXANE À UTILISER DANS LA DISPERSION DE POINTS QUANTIQUES DANS DES HÔTES DE SILICONE POUR OBTENIR DES CONVERTISSEURS DE COULEUR POUR UN LUMINAIRE À DEL | [2018/12] |
Former [2017/22] | LIGANDS DE SILOXANE DESTINÉS À ÊTRE UTILISÉS POUR LA DISPERSION DE POINTS QUANTIQUES DANS DES HÔTES EN SILICONE POUR OBTENIR DES CONVERTISSEURS DE COULEUR POUR L'ÉCLAIRAGE À DEL | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2017 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2017 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2017 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2017 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/22] | 03.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 03.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.07.2015 | AL | 19.09.2018 | AT | 19.09.2018 | CY | 19.09.2018 | CZ | 19.09.2018 | DK | 19.09.2018 | EE | 19.09.2018 | ES | 19.09.2018 | FI | 19.09.2018 | HR | 19.09.2018 | IT | 19.09.2018 | LT | 19.09.2018 | LV | 19.09.2018 | MC | 19.09.2018 | MK | 19.09.2018 | MT | 19.09.2018 | NL | 19.09.2018 | PL | 19.09.2018 | RO | 19.09.2018 | RS | 19.09.2018 | SE | 19.09.2018 | SI | 19.09.2018 | SK | 19.09.2018 | SM | 19.09.2018 | TR | 19.09.2018 | BG | 19.12.2018 | NO | 19.12.2018 | GR | 20.12.2018 | IS | 19.01.2019 | PT | 19.01.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 21.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
MT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 21.07.2015 | |
AL | 19.09.2018 | ||
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CY | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
TR | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
MC | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SI | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
DK | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
SM | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
PT | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
AT | 19.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
EE | 19.09.2018 | ||
ES | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
SK | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
CZ | 19.09.2018 | ||
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
PL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RO | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
IT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
IS | 19.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
NL | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 19.09.2018 | |
FI | 19.09.2018 | ||
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
LV | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
HR | 19.09.2018 | ||
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
RS | 19.09.2018 | ||
SE | 19.09.2018 | ||
BG | 19.12.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
GR | 20.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 19.09.2018 | |
LT | 19.09.2018 | ||
NO | 19.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 19.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5698494 (KLINTZ RALF [DE], et al) [Y] 3,6 * the whole document *; | [A]US2010276638 (LIU MINGJUN [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013078309 (UNIV SOUTH CAROLINA [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2013114254 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XYI]WO2014064555 (KONINKL PHILIPS NV [NL]) [X] 1,2,5,7-10,14 * page 35 * * page 36 * * figure 3h * * page 11 * * page 2 * * pages 38-39 * [Y] 3,6 [I] 4,11-13,15; | [Y] - "GLUTARIC ACID AND GLUTARIMIDE", ORGANIC SYNTHESES, (19570101), vol. 37, doi:10.15227/orgsyn.037.0047, ISSN 0078-6209, page 47, XP055218162 [Y] 3,6 * page 496 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.15227/orgsyn.037.0047 | [Y] - XIAOLI MENG ET AL, "Cyclization of the Acyl Glucuronide Metabolite of a Neutral Endopeptidase Inhibitor to an Electrophilic Glutarimide: Synthesis, Reactivity, and Mechanistic Analysis", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20070611), vol. 50, no. 24, doi:10.1021/jm0706766, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 6165 - 6176, XP055218142 [Y] 3,6 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0706766 |